EP3837570 - STRATIGRAPHIC BOUNDARIES IDENTIFICATION FROM CHEMOSTRATIGRAPHIC INTERVALS IN WELL LOGS BASED ON FIRST AND SECOND DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHAEL, Nikolaos A. P.O. Box 1102 Abqaiq, 31311 / SA | 02 /
CRAIGIE, Neil W. P.O. Box 1662 Dhahran, 31311 / SA | 03 /
SCHEIBE, Christian E-4550 EXPEC II (Building 728A) Dhahran, 31311 / SA | 04 /
ZUHLKE, Rainer P.O. Box 9621 Dhahran, 31311 / SA | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19759131.6 | 07.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019US45414 | Priority number, date | US201816101918 | 13.08.2018 Original published format: US201816101918 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020036778 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837570 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01V11/00, G01V99/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/24 (US);
G01V1/301 (US);
G01V20/00 (EP,US);
G01V3/38 (US);
G06F17/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG STRATIGRAPHISCHER GRENZEN AUS CHEMOSTRATIGRAPHISCHEN INTERVALLEN IN BOHRLOCHPROTOKOLLEN BASIEREND AUF ERSTEN UND ZWEITEN DERIVATEN | [2021/25] | English: | STRATIGRAPHIC BOUNDARIES IDENTIFICATION FROM CHEMOSTRATIGRAPHIC INTERVALS IN WELL LOGS BASED ON FIRST AND SECOND DERIVATIVES | [2021/25] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE LIMITES STRATIGRAPHIQUES À PARTIR D'INTERVALLES CHIMIOSTRATIGRAPHIQUES DANS DES DIAGRAPHIES DE PUITS SUR LA BASE DE PREMIÈRE ET DEUXIÈME DÉRIVÉES | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 22.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2015233846 (LOCKLAIR ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11,13,14,16-18,20 [Y] 5,12,19; | [XYI] - CRAIGIE NEIL W ET AL, "Chemostratigraphy of the Ordovician Sarah Formation, North West Saudi Arabia: An integrated approach to reservoir correlation", MARINE AND PETROLEUM GEOLOGY, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC, GUILDFORD, GB, (20160812), vol. 77, doi:10.1016/J.MARPETGEO.2016.07.009, ISSN 0264-8172, pages 1056 - 1080, XP029737466 [X] 1,8,15 * page 1065 - page 1076 * * figures 7-18 * [Y] 4-7,11-14,18-20 [I] 2,3,9,10,16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.marpetgeo.2016.07.009 | [XAY] - A S Andrew ET AL, "Application of chemostratigraphy to petroleum exploration and field appraisal: An example from the Surat Basin", SPE Asia Pacific Oil & Gas Conference, (19960101), URL: https://www.onepetro.org/download/conference-paper/SPE-37008-MS?id=conference-paper/SPE-37008-MS, (20191118), XP055643607 [X] 1,8,15 * page 422, paragraph "Methods" - page 424, paragraph "Discussion" * * figure 3 * [A] 2,3,5,9,10,12,16,17,19 [Y] 4,6,7,11,13,14,18,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/37008-MS | [A] - HARRY ROWE ET AL, "The quantification and application of handheld energy-dispersive x-ray fluorescence (ED-XRF) in mudrock chemostratigraphy and geochemistry", CHEMICAL GEOLOGY., NL, (20120901), vol. 324-325, doi:10.1016/j.chemgeo.2011.12.023, ISSN 0009-2541, pages 122 - 131, XP055643638 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 129, paragraphs 5.2 Appl. to chemostrat. & paleo-redox studies * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chemgeo.2011.12.023 | [A] - ALESSANDRO POZZI ET AL, "Wellsite Chemostratigraphy in the Petroleum Province of Anadarko Basin: How Thermal Pulses, Deposition and Diagenesis Influence Hydrocarbon Accumulation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH UNCONVENTIONAL RESOURCES TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, Tulsa, OK, USA, (20170101), doi:10.15530/urtec-2017-2697615, ISBN 978-0-9912144-4-0, XP055643535 [A] 1-20 * page 3535, paragraph last * * page 3537, paragraph "Theory and Method" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15530/urtec-2017-2697615 | [A] - HARRY ROWE ET AL, "Core Chemostratigraphy and Elemental Geochemistry Along a Dip-Section, Pearsall Formation, Lower Cretaceous, Central to South Texas", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD UNCONVENTIONAL RESOURCES TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, Tulsa, OK, USA, (20150101), doi:10.15530/urtec-2015-2154897, ISBN 978-0-9912144-2-6, XP055643573 [A] 1-20 * page 362, paragraph "Summary" - page 363, paragraph "Methods" * * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15530/urtec-2015-2154897 |