EP3833725 - A CATALYTIC REMEDY FOR ADVANCED UCO BLEED REDUCTION IN RECYCLE HYDROCRACKING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 5001 Executive Parkway San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2021/24] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAESEN, Theodorus Ludovicus Michael Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
BLACKWELL, Derek Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 03 /
DUMA, Viorel Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 04 /
KOMALARAJUN, Varut Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 05 /
KUPERMAN, Alexander E. Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 06 /
RYU, Hyunu Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 07 /
TREVINO, Horacio Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 08 /
YOON, Alex Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 09 /
MUKHERJEE, Ujjal Chevron U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 6006 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/24] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19759132.4 | 07.08.2019 | [2021/24] | WO2019US45415 | Priority number, date | US201862715557P | 07.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862715557 P | US201916533510 | 06.08.2019 Original published format: US201916533510 | US201916533545 | 06.08.2019 Original published format: US201916533545 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020033483 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833725 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C10G65/12, B01J23/00, B01J23/888, B01J31/22, B01J37/00, B01J37/20, C10G69/04 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
C10G47/20 (EP,US);
C10G69/04 (EP,KR);
B01J23/002 (EP,KR);
B01J23/755 (EP,KR);
B01J23/882 (EP,KR);
B01J23/883 (EP,KR);
B01J23/888 (EP,KR);
B01J23/8885 (EP,KR);
B01J31/0211 (US);
B01J31/022 (EP);
B01J31/04 (US);
B01J31/2204 (US);
B01J31/2239 (EP,KR);
B01J35/613 (EP,KR);
B01J35/615 (EP,KR);
B01J35/633 (EP,KR);
B01J35/647 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0009 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0018 (EP,KR);
B01J37/031 (EP,KR);
B01J37/20 (EP,KR,US);
C10G47/34 (EP,US);
C10G65/12 (EP,KR,US);
C10G67/02 (US);
B01J2231/646 (US);
B01J2235/15 (EP,KR);
B01J2523/00 (EP);
B01J2531/0211 (US);
B01J2531/64 (EP);
B01J2531/66 (EP);
B01J2531/845 (EP);
B01J2531/847 (EP);
B01J31/223 (EP);
B01J35/80 (EP,KR);
C10G2300/1074 (US);
C10G2300/70 (US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/62, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/845 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/62, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/847 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/845 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHES HEILMITTEL ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON FORTGESCHRITTENEM UCO-AUSLASS IN RECYCLING-HYDROCRACKOPERATIONEN | [2021/24] | English: | A CATALYTIC REMEDY FOR ADVANCED UCO BLEED REDUCTION IN RECYCLE HYDROCRACKING OPERATIONS | [2021/24] | French: | REMÈDE CATALYTIQUE DE RÉDUCTION AMÉLIORÉE DE PURGE UCO DANS DES OPÉRATIONS D'HYDROCRAQUAGE AVEC RECYCLAGE | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 26.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1267416 (CHEVRON RES [US]) [A] 1-19 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2009107883 (MAESEN THEODORUS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * examples 1-26 ** claims 1-20 *; | [A]US7622034 (THAKKAR VASANT P [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [XI]US2015136646 (ZHAN BI-ZENG [US], et al) [X] 1-5,14-19 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 49] - [0050] - [0 53] , [0 59] - [0060] - [0 62] , [0 72] * * claims 1, 22-30 * * example 1 * [I] 6-13; | [A]US2015136645 (BHATTACHARYA SUBHASIS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 2 *; | [A]US9919987 (ZHAN BI-ZENG [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-13 * * examples 1-6 * | by applicant | US7910761 |