EP3843855 - A TOOL HAVING A PUMP AND A PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holmatro B.V. Lissenveld 30 4941 VL Raamsdonksveer / NL | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BRINK, Titus Ludger Bunderbeemd 21 4824 NN Breda / NL | 02 /
SCHELLEKENS, Marcus Petrus Augustinus Buitenerf 23 4824 HA Breda / NL | 03 /
WENSVEEN, Remon Vincent Abeelhof 10 4254 BX Sleeuwijk / NL | 04 /
VAN EINDHOVEN, Rene Wilhelmus Johannes Almystraat 64 5061 PA OISTERWIJK / NL | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19759597.8 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019EP73136 | Priority number, date | NL20182021528 | 30.08.2018 Original published format: NL 2021528 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043847 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843855 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62B3/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A62B3/005 (EP,RU,US);
A62B3/00 (RU);
B25F5/005 (US);
F04B17/03 (US);
F04B19/04 (US);
F04B23/02 (US);
F04B51/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG MIT PUMPE UND PUMPE | [2021/27] | English: | A TOOL HAVING A PUMP AND A PUMP | [2021/27] | French: | OUTIL MUNI D'UNE POMPE, ET POMPE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2012318545 (SCHREIBER ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-4,11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039]; figure - * * paragraphs [0069] , [0077] * [A] 5,6 [I] 7-10; | [A]US2014070924 (WENGER KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0007]; figure - *; | [A]WO2017190799 (LUKAS HYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11* page 7, line 30 - line 32 * | by applicant | EP3345656 | EP3360649 |