EP3759070 - WATER SOLUBLE SALTS OF LIPIDATED PEPTIDES AND METHODS FOR PREPARING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridge Biotherapeutics, Inc. Suite 303, 58, Pangyo-ro 255beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13486 / KR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Sang Uk Suite 303, 58, Pangyo-ro 255beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13486 / KR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Leonard, Thomas Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19759922.8 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019KR02397 | Priority number, date | US201862636552P | 28.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862636552 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168357 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759070 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, C07K5/117, C07D207/16, A61K9/28, A61K9/16, A61K9/48, A61K9/50, // A61K38/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/4891 (EP);
C07K5/1024 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/542 (EP,US);
A61K47/543 (KR);
A61K9/1635 (EP);
A61K9/2846 (EP);
A61K9/485 (EP);
A61K9/5026 (EP);
A61P1/04 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
C07K1/02 (US);
C07K19/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | C07D207/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHE SALZE VON LIPIDIERTEN PEPTIDEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2021/01] | English: | WATER SOLUBLE SALTS OF LIPIDATED PEPTIDES AND METHODS FOR PREPARING AND USING THE SAME | [2021/01] | French: | SELS HYDROSOLUBLES DE PEPTIDES LIPIDÉS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2021 | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4471115 (REINER ALBERTO [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * See abstract; claims 1-9; column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 23. *; | [A]WO2010059922 (LIGAND PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; claim 11. *; | [A]WO2013190497 (RADIKAL THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* See abstract; claim 1. *; | [Y]CN103724204 (UNIV BEIJING CHEMICAL) [Y] 1-15 * See claims 1-8. *; | [Y]US2017008924 (LEE KWANGHO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See abstract; claims 1-26; paragraph [0112]. * |