EP3761427 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO Daisuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA Kaori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MATSUO Yuta c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
UEHARA Yukitoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19760546.2 | 07.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019JP04323 | Priority number, date | JP20180035667 | 28.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018035667 | [2021/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019167581 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761427 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M4/131, H01M4/133, H01M4/36, H01M4/48, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, H01M4/38, H01M4/134, // H01M4/02 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/134 (EP);
H01M4/386 (EP);
H01M4/483 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M4/622 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H01M10/052, H01M4/13, H01M4/133, H01M4/36, H01M4/48, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2021/01] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/01] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2020 | Translation filed | 24.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 27.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2010165471 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0081]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]WO2017022731 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8* paragraphs [0003] , [0 11] - [0012] - [0 40] - [0042] *; | [A]US2017324097 (LEE YONGGUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] - [0225]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US2018013135 (LAU JOSHUA J [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0009] - [0012] , [0035] - [0037] * | International search | [A]JP2000348730 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2003077463 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-8 * , L) *; | [A]JP2006059704 (JFE CHEMICAL CORP) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2007214038 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2010165471 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]WO2016175560 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * , & JP 2018-507528 A & US 2018/0097255 A1 & EP 3249720 A1 & KR 10-2016-0128834 A & CN 107534125 A *; | [A]WO2017022731 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , & CN 107534186 A *; | [A]WO2017094712 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , & US 2018/0358610 A1 & EP 3386022 A1 & CN 108292779 A *; | [PA]WO2018179817 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [PA] 1-8* , * | by applicant | JP20000348730 |