EP3759160 - POLYLACTIDE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 600 McNamara Alumni Center 200 Oak Street SE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455-2020 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIRLAM, Philip T. 371 E Reed St San Jose, California 95112 / US | 02 /
GOLDFELD, David J. 215 St. Marys Avenue SE, Apt. 4 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | 03 /
HILLMYER, Marc A. 4916 Knox Ave. S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/01] | 01 /
DIRLAM, Philip T. 371 E Reed St San Jose CA 95112 / US | ||
02 /
GOLDFELD, David J. 215 St. Marys Avenue SE, Apt. 4 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | |||
03 /
HILLMYER, Marc A. 4916 Knox Ave. S. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19761085.0 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US19779 | Priority number, date | US201862636050P | 27.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862636050 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019168940 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3759160 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3759160 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/04, C08J9/12, C08J9/14 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C08G63/08 (EP,US);
C08J9/0023 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP);
C08J9/122 (EP,US);
C08J2203/06 (EP,US);
C08J2205/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYLACTID-SCHAUMSTOFFE | [2021/01] | English: | POLYLACTIDE FOAMS | [2021/01] | French: | MOUSSES DE POLYLACTIDE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5210108 (SPINU MARIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 8; claims 1-19 *; | [Y]US6444720 (KLESCZEWSKI BERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, lines 4-9; examples 1-3 ** column 5, lines 12-14; claims 1,7,14 * | International search | [Y]US4013701 (JABS GERT, et al) [Y] 13-15 * ; column 10, lines 40-45 *; | [Y]US5210108 (SPINU MARIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 11-15, 20-25 * ; abstract; column 3, lines 1-5, 30-40; column 10, lines 50-55; column 11, lines 1-20 *; | [Y]US6303667 (KRUECKE WERNER [DE]) [Y] 20, 23-25 * ; abstract; column 2, lines 10-35, 45-50; column 3, lines 1-11; column 4, lines 53-58 *; | [A]US2006265950 (CASTLEBERRY WAYNE [US]) [A] 16-18* ; abstract; paragraphs [0012], [0014]-[0015], [0035] *; | [A]US7199082 (CHAPMAN KENT D [US], et al) [A] 16-18 * ; figures 9-10; column 12, lines 55-65; column 15, lines 60-68; column 16, lines 1-10 *; | [Y]US9138308 (SCHWAB JUSTIN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7-9, 11-15, 21 * ; abstract; column 2, lines 45-50; column 70, lines 25-30; column 74, lines 30-50; column 82, lines 40-45; column 88, lines 10-20 *; | [A]US9540777 (TETRAULT CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 6 * ; column 21, lines 50-55; column 34, lines 1-5 *; | [A]US2017258634 (DE JUAN JR EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 6 * ; paragraph [0205] *; | [Y]US9806338 (DAI SHENG [US], et al) [Y] 7-9, 11, 22 * ; abstract; column 8, lines 25-30; column 9, lines 15-30; column 10, lines 60-65 *; | [Y] - XU, LQ et al., "Foaming of Poly(lactic acid) Using Supercritical Carbon Dioxide as Foaming Agent: Influence of Crystallinity and Spherulite Size on Cell Structure and Expansion Ratio", Industrial and Engineering Chemistry Research, (20150000), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 2277 - 2286, XP055702675 [Y] 20-22 * ; abstract; page 2280, figure 2; page 2280, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie403594t | [Y] - DI, Y et al., "Rheology in Processing of Polymeric Foams", Annual Transactions Of The Nordic Rheology Society, (20050000), vol. 13, pages 37 - 43, XP055702673 [Y] 2-3 * . column 2. paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US5210108 | US6444720 | - BRUTMAN et al., "Polylactide Vitrimers", ACSMacro Letters, (20140000), vol. 3, doi:10.1021/mz500269w, pages 607 - 610, XP055123182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mz500269w | - BRUTMAN et al., "Polylactide Vitrimers", A CS Macro Letters, (20140000), vol. 3, doi:10.1021/mz500269w, pages 607 - 610, XP055123182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mz500269w |