EP3759722 - METHOD, COMPUTING DEVICE AND WEARABLE DEVICE FOR SLEEP STAGE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIRAVANICHKUL, Maneerat c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 02 /
JIRAJARAS, Thada c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 03 /
THAVEEPRUNGSRIPORN, Visit c/o Nitto Denko Asia Technical Centre Pte Ltd 3 Biopolis Drive, Synapse, Unit 03-17/18 Singapore 138623 / SG | 04 /
SRISUKH, Pannawit c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 05 /
THIAMTAWAN, Pongsarun c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Bradley, Susan Jane Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19761655.0 | 28.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019SG50111 | Priority number, date | SG20181001850P | 02.03.2018 Original published format: SG10201801850P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168474 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759722 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G06N3/08, A61B5/00, A61B5/024, G06F17/18, G06N20/00, G06N3/04, G16H20/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/4812 (EP,KR,US);
G16H50/70 (KR);
A61B5/02405 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/4815 (KR);
A61B5/4839 (EP);
A61B5/4848 (US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B5/7267 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR);
G06N3/084 (EP,KR);
G16H20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G16H20/70 (EP,KR);
G16H40/67 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,KR,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G16H50/50 (KR);
A61B5/0022 (US);
A61B5/024 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP);
A61B5/72 (US);
A61B5/725 (EP);
G06F17/18 (US);
G06N3/02 (US);
G06N3/044 (US);
G06N3/0442 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
H04L67/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, RECHNERVORRICHTUNG UND AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SCHLAFSTADIEN | [2021/01] | English: | METHOD, COMPUTING DEVICE AND WEARABLE DEVICE FOR SLEEP STAGE DETECTION | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE ET DISPOSITIF VESTIMENTAIRE POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN STADE DU SOMMEIL | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009198145 (CHOW HARRISON [US]); | [XI]US2017274174 (PURDON PATRICK L [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2011218454 (LOW PHILIP [US]); | [X]US2015147418 (URADE YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]AU2015268701 (NEUROVIGIL INC [US]); | [X]CN105982643 (IND TECH RES INST); | [A]US2017055898 (BANDYOPADHYAY AMRIT [US], et al); | [A]US2017273617 (KAJI HIROTAKA [JP]); | [A]US2017360308 (FONSECA PEDRO MIGUEL [BE], et al) | by applicant | US9655559 | US2017274174 |