EP3827221 - VEHICLE NAVIGATION ASSISTANCE METHOD AND DEVICE USING AN INVARIANT KALMAN FILTER AND A NAVIGATION STATUS OF A SECOND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN ELECTRONICS & DEFENSE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Emmanuel c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 02 /
BARRAU, Axel c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 03 /
BERNAL, Thomas c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/22] | 01 /
ROBERT, Emmanuel c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
02 /
BARRAU, Axel c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | |||
03 /
BERNAL, Thomas c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19761915.8 | 23.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019FR51826 | Priority number, date | FR20180056802 | 23.07.2018 Original published format: FR 1856802 | [2021/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020021194 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827221 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827221 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G01S19/393 (EP,IL,US);
G01C21/00 (IL);
G06F18/2113 (IL,US);
G01S19/51 (US);
G01S19/52 (US);
G05D1/101 (US);
G05D1/46 (US);
G06F7/405 (US);
G06F7/42 (US);
G08G5/0047 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGNAVIGATIONSASSISTENZVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES INVARIANTEN KALMAN-FILTERS UND EINES NAVIGATIONSSTATUS EINES ZWEITEN FAHRZEUGS | [2021/22] | English: | VEHICLE NAVIGATION ASSISTANCE METHOD AND DEVICE USING AN INVARIANT KALMAN FILTER AND A NAVIGATION STATUS OF A SECOND VEHICLE | [2021/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA NAVIGATION D'UN PORTEUR À L'AIDE D'UN FILTRE DE KALMAN INVARIANT ET D'UN ÉTAT DE NAVIGATION D'UN DEUXIÈME PORTEUR | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 19.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | GB | 23.07.2023 | IE | 23.07.2023 | LU | 23.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
GB | 23.07.2023 | ||
LU | 23.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 23.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A] - Scott M. Bezick ET AL, "Inertial Navigation for Guided Missile Systems", JOHNS HOPKINS APL TECHNICAL DIGEST, VOLUME 28, NUMBER 4 (2010), IEEE, (20100101), pages 331 - 342, XP055594754 [A] 1-14 * section: transfer alignment; page 336 * | [AD] - AXEL BARRAU ET AL, "The Invariant Extended Kalman Filter as a Stable Observer", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUTOMATIC CONTROL., US, (20170401), vol. 62, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TAC.2016.2594085, ISSN 0018-9286, pages 1797 - 1812, XP055595129 [AD] 1-14 * section III-V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAC.2016.2594085 | [A] - Axel Barrau, "Non-linear state error based extended Kalman filters with applications to navigation", PhD thesis, (20150915), URL: https://www.theses.fr/2015ENMP0080.pdf, (20190607), XP055595138 [A] 1-14 * chapitres 3-5 * | by applicant | - "Invariant Extended Kalman Filter: theory and application to a velocity-aided attitude estimation problem", BONNABLE, S.MARTIN, P.SALAÜN, E., Décision and Control, 2009 held jointly with the 2009 28th Chinese Control Conférence. CDC/CCC 2009. Proceedings of the 48th IEEE Conférence on, IEEE, (20090000), pages 1297 - 1304 | - BARRAU, A.BONNABEL, S., "The invariant extended Kalman filter as a stable observer", IEEE Transactions on Automatic Control, (20170000), vol. 62, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/TAC.2016.2594085, pages 1797 - 1812, XP055595129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAC.2016.2594085 |