EP3841664 - A SOLAR ELECTRICAL GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLIVUS LIMITED 69-71 East Street Epsom, Surrey KT17 BP / GB | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER-SWIFT, Jo Toyside Scords Lane Toys Hill Kent TN16 1QE / GB | 02 /
BAKER, James Cambridge Design Partnership, Church Road, Toft Cambridge CB23 2RF / GB | 03 /
CRUNDWELL, Ben Cambridge Design Partnership, Church Road, Toft Cambridge CB23 2RF / GB | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19761931.5 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019GB52335 | Priority number, date | GB20180013878 | 24.08.2018 Original published format: GB 201813878 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020039181 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841664 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02S20/30, H02S30/20, H02S20/32, H02S10/12 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
H02S20/30 (EP,IL);
H02S10/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01L31/0547 (GB,IL,KR);
H02S20/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01L31/03926 (IL,US);
H02S30/20 (EP,IL,KR);
H02S40/22 (IL,US);
H02S40/38 (IL,US);
Y02E10/50 (IL,KR);
Y02E10/52 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | SOLARSTROMGENERATOR | [2021/26] | English: | A SOLAR ELECTRICAL GENERATOR | [2021/26] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE SOLAIRE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 22.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JP2008151053 (UNIV NAGAOKA TECHNOLOGY, et al); | [Y]KR20090051669 (NOGUCHI TSUNEO [JP], et al); | [XYI]CN102141009 (YANGJIANG HENERY IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2011155115 (EIKO KK); | [XYI]JP2014169671 (HAMASHITA HIROSHI); | [A]CN107642456 (MAO YONGBO) |