EP3801073 - CONTAINER FOR ROD-LIKE ARTICLES OF THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEPINSKI, Piotr International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | 02 /
OWCZAREK, Radoslaw International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | 03 /
ZADECKI, Robert International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | 04 /
UGREWICZ, Grzegorz International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | 05 /
JAROSZEK, Marcin Michal International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. 26-600 Radom / PL | 06 /
HEIL, Herbert International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | 07 /
RENUKA PRASAD, Shivendra Sathvik International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Markieta, Jaroslaw Franciszek Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych J. Markieta, M. Zielinska-Lazarowicz Sp. p. Bukowinska 2 lok 160 02-703 Warszawa / PL | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19761942.2 | 05.06.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019IB54658 | Priority number, date | PL20180425824 | 05.06.2018 Original published format: PL 42582418 | PL20190430089 | 04.06.2019 Original published format: PL 43008919 | [2021/15] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019234642 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3801073 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/352, A24C5/354, A24C5/356, A24C5/358, B65D25/04, B65D83/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A24C5/354 (EP);
A24C5/352 (EP);
A24C5/356 (EP);
A24C5/358 (EP);
B65D25/04 (EP);
B65D83/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR STABFÖRMIGE ARTIKEL DER TABAKVERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE | [2021/15] | English: | CONTAINER FOR ROD-LIKE ARTICLES OF THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY | [2021/15] | French: | CONTENANT POUR DES ARTICLES EN FORME DE BOUDIN DE L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 05.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2414459 (MOLINS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * page 9, lines 10-35 * * page 10, lines 22-30 * * page 11, lines 6-10 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 14 * * page 13, lines 3-10 * * figures 1-2 * [I] 11; | [XI]US5567104 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-13 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 27 * * column 3, lines 43-64 * * column 4, lines 37-53 * * column 5, lines 9-54 * * column 6, line 45 * * column 7, lines 15-16 * * column 8, lines 25-28 * * figures 1-7 * [I] 11; | [A]US2012043233 (JOYCE KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** figures 1-6 *; | [XI]CN204751021U (HUBEI CHINA TOBACCO IND CO LTD) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 1-3 * [I] 11 |