EP3762986 - PRODUCTION OF PETROCHEMICAL FEEDSTOCKS AND PRODUCTS USING A FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 1304342 Alberta Ltd 16640 - 111 Avenue NW Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA | For all designated states 1304338 Alberta Ltd 16640 - 111 Avenue NW Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLAR, MacKenzie 16640 - 111 Ave NW Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA | 02 /
LOURENCO, Jose 16640 - 111 Ave NW Edmonton, Alberta T5M 2S5 / CA | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19763541.0 | 07.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019CA50159 | Priority number, date | CA20182997634 | 07.03.2018 Original published format: CA 2997634 | CA20183002749 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: CA 3002749 | CA20183016645 | 06.09.2018 Original published format: CA 3016645 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019169475 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762986 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0662, H01M8/04014, H01M8/04089, H01M8/0612, H01M8/0637, H01M8/0668 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C07C29/48 (EP,US);
C10G50/00 (EP);
H01M8/04014 (EP,US);
H01M8/04097 (EP);
H01M8/0618 (EP);
H01M8/0625 (EP,US);
H01M8/0637 (EP);
H01M8/0662 (EP);
H01M8/0668 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P30/00 (EP);
Y02P30/20 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/48, C07C31/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | H01M8/0662 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON PETROCHEMISCHEN EINSÄTZEN UND PRODUKTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2021/02] | English: | PRODUCTION OF PETROCHEMICAL FEEDSTOCKS AND PRODUCTS USING A FUEL CELL | [2021/02] | French: | PRODUCTION DE MATIÈRES PREMIÈRES ET DE PRODUITS PÉTROCHIMIQUES À L'AIDE D'UNE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 06.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6187465 (GALLOWAY TERRY R [US]) [X] 1-7,10-12 * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 34; figure 1 * [I] 8,9,13; | [XI]US2004115492 (GALLOWAY TERRY R [US]) [X] 1-7,10-12 * columns 35-41; figure 1 * [I] 8,9,13; | [A]JP2015502639 (NN) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2016130513 (GALLOWAY TERRY R [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017132773 (EPIPHANY ENERGY CORP [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017189785 (FUELCELL ENERGY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5084362 (FAROOQUE MOHAMMAD [US]) [Y] 1-44 * col. 1, lines 41 to col. 3, lines 66, Fig. 1; *; | [Y]US2005220695 (ABATZOGLOU NICOLAS [CA], et al) [Y] 1-44 * paragraphs [0017], [0020], [0053], [0079], [0145], [0145]-[0150], Figure 13, claims 8-9; *; | [Y]US2007099038 (GALLOWAY TERRY R [US]) [Y] 1-44 * paragraphs [0012]-[0015], [0025]-[0026], [0037], Figure 2; *; | [Y]CA2690836 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 1-44 * page 2 line 10-19, page 7 line 1 to page 8 line 10, Fig. 1, claim 1; *; | [Y]JP2010015860 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 1-44 * machine translation of paragraphs [0009], [00015]-[0019], [0047], [0057]-[0059]; *; | [Y]US2010261938 (OLAH GEORGE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * paragraphs [0028]-[0031], [0043]; *; | [Y]US2014272638 (BERLOWITZ PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * paragraphs [0090]-[0095], [0147], [0156]-[0157], [0161], [0162], [0185]; *; | [Y]US2016351930 (JAHNKE FRED C [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * Figs 3A, 11C, paragraphs [0036], [0124], [0093], [0044]; *; | [Y]WO2017059515 (1304338 ALBERTA LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 1-44 * Figs. 1-8, paragraphs [0021]-[0033]; *; | [Y]WO2017059516 (ALBERTA LTD 1304342 [CA], et al) [Y] 1-44 * Figs. 1-16, claims 1-20; *; | [Y]WO2017096467 (ALBERTA LTD 1304342 [CA], et al) [Y] 1-44 * Fig. 1, paragraphs [0005], [0006], [0026]; *; | [PX]WO2018044913 (FUELCELL ENERGY INC [US]) [PX] 1-44* whole document. * | by applicant | US6187465 | US2004115492 |