EP3763083 - HYBRID LEO/HAPS CONSTELLATION FOR FIXED BROADBAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aalyria Technologies, Inc. 41491 Carriage Horse Drive Aldie, Virginia 20105 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Loon LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRITT, Brian 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19763740.8 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US20215 | Priority number, date | US201815916646 | 09.03.2018 Original published format: US201815916646 | US201916251632 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US201916251632 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173127 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763083 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3763083 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/112, H04W40/38, H04W40/24, H04L41/122, H04B7/185, H04L45/125, H04L41/0896, H04B10/118, H04W24/02, // H04W8/22, H04L43/16, H04L43/0882 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04B10/1129 (EP,AU,US);
H04L41/12 (AU,US);
H04B10/11 (US);
H04B10/118 (EP,AU,US);
H04B7/18504 (EP);
H04L41/0896 (EP);
H04L41/122 (EP);
H04L43/0882 (EP,AU,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,AU,US);
H04L45/125 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,AU,US);
H04W40/20 (AU,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | H04B10/112, H04L12/24, H04B10/118, H04W24/02, H04L12/911, H04L12/729, // H04W8/22, H04L12/26 | ||
Former IPC [2021/02] | H04L12/24, H04B10/118, H04B10/00, H04W8/22, H04W40/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE LEO/HAPS-KONSTELLATION FÜR FESTES BREITBAND | [2021/02] | English: | HYBRID LEO/HAPS CONSTELLATION FOR FIXED BROADBAND | [2021/02] | French: | CONSTELLATION HYBRIDE LEO/HAPS POUR LARGE BANDE FIXE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013303218 (TELLER ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025] - [0029] , [0058] - [0061] - [0069] , [0070] , [0108] , [0120] - [0122] - [0129] - [0131] *; | [A]US2016037434 (GOPAL RAJEEV [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0014] , [0043] , [0044] , [0065] , [0066] , [0068] , [6972] *; | [I]WO2017189051 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] , [0017] , [0018] , [0020] , [0022] - [0028] - [0037] , [0038] * * figures 1,2A, 2B, 3 *; | [A] - BARRITT BRIAN ET AL, "Operating a UAV mesh & internet backhaul network using temporospatial SDN", 2017 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20170304), doi:10.1109/AERO.2017.7943701, pages 1 - 7, XP033102794 [A] 1-15 * sections 2, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2017.7943701 | [A] - BARRITT BRIAN ET AL, "Loon SDN: Applicability to NASA's next-generation space communications architecture", 2018 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20180303), doi:10.1109/AERO.2018.8396643, pages 1 - 9, XP033365389 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2018.8396643 | International search | [A]US2009103452 (HORVATH JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-20* See paragraph [0019]; and figure 3. *; | [A]US8190147 (KAUFFMAN DONALD C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 4, lines 12-46; claim 1; and figure 3A. *; | [A]US2013303218 (TELLER ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0049], [0065], [0112]-[0115]; and figures 2, 5A-5B. *; | [A]US9270372 (MINISCALCO WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-20 * See column 3, lines 14-25; and figure 1A. *; | [A]US9438341 (BRUMLEY II ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 10, line 51 - column 12, line 26; and figure 3. * | by applicant | WO2017189051 |