EP3764700 - CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Tomoki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Mitsuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
KOZUKA, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
GOHARA, Kunio c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIKAWA, Yoshishige c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
NAKAI, Shinya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
SUZUKI, Junya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19764400.8 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019JP07575 | Priority number, date | US201862640758P | 09.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640758 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172044 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764700 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04W88/06, H04W4/70, H04L12/28, // H04W48/16 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04B17/23 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP);
H04L12/282 (US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2841 (US);
H04L2012/285 (US);
H04M1/72412 (EP);
H04M1/72415 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | H04W48/18, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2021/02] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2020 | Translation filed | 07.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014171065 (GRAESSLEY JOSHUA V [US]); | [Y]US2015016406 (HOLOSTOV VLADIMIR [US], et al); | [A]US2016360461 (TRAVOSTINO FRANCO [US], et al); | International search | [XY]JP2006005772 (FUJITSU LTD); | [XY]JP2006074295 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2013229915 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2016184817 (KDDI CORP) | by applicant | JP2016063520 |