EP3749572 - SUBSURFACE MULTI-MISSION DIVER TRANSPORT VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patriot3, Inc. 11040 Pierson Dr. Fredericksburg, VA 22408 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUQUA, Charles Louis 14451 Minnieville Road Woodbridge, VA 22193 / US | 02 /
KAHRE, Steven Scott 9407 Quail Meadows Drive Spotsylvania, VA 22553 / US | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Sach, Greg Robert Sach & Associates Siedlungsstrasse 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19764747.2 | 11.03.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019US21626 | Priority number, date | US201862640905P | 09.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640905 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173825 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749572 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/00, B63B35/00, B63H1/00, B63B17/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
B63C11/46 (EP,US);
B63G8/001 (EP,US);
B63G8/08 (EP,US);
B63H5/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | UNTERWASSERTAUCHERTRANSPORTFAHRZEUG FÜR MEHRERE MISSIONEN | [2020/51] | English: | SUBSURFACE MULTI-MISSION DIVER TRANSPORT VEHICLE | [2020/51] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT DE PLONGEUR MULTI-MISSION SOUS-MARIN | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE4229670 (MUHS HENRIK [DE]) [I] 1-15 * figure - *; | [XI]DE10235842 (LEITHOLF PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim - * [I] 3; | [I]WO2011119110 (OPCON PTE LTD [SG], et al) [I] 1-3,6-9 * figure -; claim - *; | [XI]US2015370252 (HANSON BRUCE BECKER [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0019] , [0081]; figure -; claim - * [I] 4,5,7-10,12-15; | [XI]WO2017006240 (ABYSSNAUT [FR]) [X] 1,6,13 * paragraph [0033]; figure -; claim - * [I] 2,7-12,14,15; | [A]US2018001981 (BOSS JOHN [US]) [A] 1-15* figure - * | International search | [XY]US2710458 (REED DONALD G) [X] 1-2, 6, 12-13, 20 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-4; col 1 In 15; col 2 In 15-40; col 4 In 67-75 * [Y] 3-5, 7-9; | [A]US3685480 (PERONI GEORGE J) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]US5158034 (HSU CHI-HSUEH [TW]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US5349918 (ELIE CHRISTIAN [CA]) [Y] 1, 18 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-4; col 2 In 20-25 *; | [Y]US5483144 (MAREK ALBERT [US]) [Y] 12-14 * , entire document, especially Fig 7 *; | [X]US5666900 (CARROLL III ALF L [US], et al) [X] 1, 10 * , entire document, especially Fig 1, 4, 6; col 1 In 56; col 3 In 31-51; col 7 In 42-45 *; | [Y]US6684803 (DICKSON TREVOR ALAN [NZ]) [Y] 11 * , entire document, especially Fig 2 *; | [Y]US6976445 (ARNESON WESTON [US]) [Y] 3-5, 7-9 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-2 *; | [Y]US7290496 (ASFAR KHALED R [JO], et al) [Y] 4-5, 8-9 * , entire document, especially Fig 23; col 1 In 9 *; | [Y]WO2008088290 (NG AIK LEONG [SG]) [Y] 1, 17 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-6, 21A *; | [Y]US7549902 (JANSEN PATRICK LEE [US]) [Y] 1, 18 * , entire document, espcially Fig 5 *; | [Y]US8276536 (WINSKY JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1, 17, 19 * , entire document especially Fig 1,5 *; | [Y]US2014318435 (MURRAY III JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 1, 19 * , entire document, especially Fig 1, 3A, 3B *; | [XY]CN105691561 (HEFEI XIUZHU BIOLOGICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1, 10, 15-16 * , entire document, especially Fig 1, 7-8, 12-13; para [0005]; para [00049]; para [0053] * [Y] 11-14; | [XP] - H I Sutton, "Patriot-3M diver propulsion", Covert Shores, (20180807), URL: http://www.hisutton.com/Patriot3M.html, XP055638240 [XP] 1-20 | by applicant | DE4229670 | US2015370252 | WO2017006240 |