EP3847054 - VEHICLE SEAT, IN PARTICULAR REAR BENCH WITH BELT LOCK POCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/28] | VEHICLE SEAT, IN PARTICULAR REAR SEAT BENCH WITH A SEAT BUCKLE POCKET | ||
[2023/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORST, Vanessa Kolberger Ring 1 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
STEFANI, Nils Friedensstraße 40 38486 Klötze / DE | 03 /
KIRST, Philipp Helmstedter Straße 93 38126 Braunschweig / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19765207.6 | 02.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019EP73299 | Priority number, date | DE201810214931 | 03.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018214931 | [2021/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020048901 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3847054 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3847054 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/70, B60R22/22, B60N2/60, B60N2/28, B60R22/02 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B60N2/70 (EP);
B60N2/2887 (EP);
B60N2/6009 (EP);
B60R22/26 (EP);
B60R2022/021 (EP);
B60R2022/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ, INSBESONDERE RÜCKSITZBANK MIT EINER GURTSCHLOSSTASCHE | [2021/28] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT, IN PARTICULAR REAR BENCH WITH BELT LOCK POCKET | [2023/11] | French: | SIÈGE POUR VÉHICULE, EN PARTICULIER BANQUETTE ARRIÈRE AVEC POCHE DE VERROU DE CEINTURE | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/28] | VEHICLE SEAT, IN PARTICULAR REAR SEAT BENCH WITH A SEAT BUCKLE POCKET | ||
Former [2021/28] | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE, EN PARTICULIER BANQUETTE ARRIÈRE, MUNIE D'UN COMPARTIMENT POUR BOUCLE DE CEINTURE | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 06.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IE | 02.09.2023 | LU | 02.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IE | 02.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0459839 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XAY]US5139311 (IMAI SHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-12 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5 [Y] 10; | [A]EP0516512 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [YA]US2008211219 (LAMPARTER RONALD C [US]) [Y] 10 * figure 2 * [A] 1; | [A]US2009094807 (SUGIMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2017355286 (TERADA SHO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | DE19853149 |