EP3847290 - ALUMINIUM ALLOY, SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT, CAN, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SLUG, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CAN, AND USE OF AN ALUMINIUM ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuman Aluminium Austria GmbH Werkstrasse 1 3182 Marktl im Traisental / AT | For all designated states Tubex Holding GmbH Fabrikstrasse 1 72414 Rangendingen / DE | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIMMER, Alexander Hans-Czettelstraße 4 3205 Weinburg / AT | 02 /
KLARUM, Helmut Lehmbodengasse 20 3107 St. Pölten / AT | 03 /
HOCHECKER, Otmar Kernhofer Straße 51 3195 Kernhof / AT | 04 /
WIEST, Dietmar Fasanenstraße 17 72414 Rangendingen / DE | 05 /
STUMPP, Sebastian Wilhelmstraße 76 72145 Hirrlingen / DE | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19765435.3 | 03.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019EP73474 | Priority number, date | DE201810215243 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018215243 | [2021/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020048988 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3847290 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3847290 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/04, B65B31/00, B65D83/14, C22C21/00 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (US);
C21D8/0236 (US);
C22F1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG, HALBZEUG, DOSE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BUTZEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DOSE SOWIE VERWENDUNG EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG | [2021/28] | English: | ALUMINIUM ALLOY, SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT, CAN, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SLUG, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CAN, AND USE OF AN ALUMINIUM ALLOY | [2021/28] | French: | ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM, PRODUIT SEMI-FINI, PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UNE PASTILLE, PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UNE BOÎTE ET UTILISATION D'UN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2023
20.10.2023
ADMISSIBLE Ball Corporation 9200 W. 108th Circle Westminster, CO 80021 / US Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2023/48] | 30.10.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.02.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | IE | 03.09.2023 | LU | 03.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
IE | 03.09.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014227130 (OHASHI YOSHIMASA [JP], et al); | [A]EP3031941 (MORAVIA CANS A S [CZ]); | [A]EP3075875 (TALUM D D KIDRICEVO [SI]) | by applicant | FR2457328 | EP1064413 | US2006021415 | JP2008169417 | US2014298641 | Opposition | WO2013040339 | EP3075875 |