EP3849895 - SYSTEM FOR TRANSFER OF A FLUID PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Technologies Route des Clérimois 89100 Sens / FR | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATOUILLAT, Guillaume 40 rue du Château 89260 La Chapelle Sur Oreuse / FR | 02 /
PAQUET, Stéphane 16A grande rue 89260 VOISINES / FR | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19765523.6 | 12.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP74430 | Priority number, date | FR20180058332 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858332 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020053366 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849895 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3849895 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63B27/24, B67D9/02 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
B63B27/24 (EP,KR);
B63B27/34 (KR,US);
B67D9/00 (EP);
B67D9/02 (EP,KR,US);
B63B27/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES FLÜSSIGEN PRODUKTS | [2021/29] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TRANSFER OF A FLUID PRODUCT | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LE TRANSFERT D'UN PRODUIT FLUIDE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 06.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NO | 05.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3085593 (SORENSEN HARRY E) [A] 1-5,8-13,16,20* column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 8; figures 1,4 *; | [AD]US2017057806 (PERDRIX FREDERIC VINCENT [GB], et al) [AD] 1-20 * paragraphs [0033] - [0041]; figures 1,2,4,6 *; | [A]US2018105234 (PERDRIX FREDERIC VINCENT [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0042] - [0048] - [0051] , [0 56] - [0061]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US2017057806 |