EP3830590 - BUILT-IN MACHINERY TO CARRY OUT TEMPERATURE- DEPENDENT TESTS ON ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS SUCH AS CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microtest S.p.A. Via Enrico Fermi 8 56010 Vicopisano (PI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states Microtest S.p.A. Via Enrico Fermi 8 56010 Vicopisano / IT | ||
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Microtest S.r.l. Via Enrico Fermi 8 56010 Vicopisano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMELIO, Giuseppe Via di Cianciano 87 San Pietro a Vico 55100 Lucca / IT | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Emmi, Mario Studio Brevetti Turini Srl Viale Matteotti, 25 50121 Firenze (FI) / IT | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19765804.0 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019IB56358 | Priority number, date | IT20180007609 | 30.07.2018 Original published format: IT201800007609 | [2021/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026092 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830590 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3830590 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G01R1/04 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G01R31/2874 (EP);
G01R1/04 (EP);
G01R31/2862 (EP);
G01R31/2867 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINGEBAUTE MASCHINE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON TEMPERATURABHÄNGIGEN TESTS AN ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTEN WIE CHIPS | [2021/23] | English: | BUILT-IN MACHINERY TO CARRY OUT TEMPERATURE- DEPENDENT TESTS ON ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS SUCH AS CHIPS | [2021/23] | French: | MACHINERIE INTÉGRÉE POUR EFFECTUER DES ESSAIS DÉPENDANT DE LA TEMPÉRATURE SUR DES COMPOSANTS ÉLECTRONIQUES TELS QUE DES PUCES | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 25.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5220277 (REITINGER ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,10-16,21,23,24 * figures 1,2 ** column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 65 *; | [X]JPH11271389 (ADVANTEST CORP) [X] 1,21 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2004077200 (ISHIKAWA TAKAJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,21 * figures 22,23,27,28,14,18 *; | [X]WO2009118855 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 1-4 * |