EP3767350 - OPTICAL FIBER BUNDLE PROVIDED WITH BEAM SUPERPOSING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMA, Masaki FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
MATSUSHITA, Shunichi FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19766718.1 | 12.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019JP10064 | Priority number, date | JP20180044323 | 12.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018044323 | [2021/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019176953 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767350 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/04, B23K26/064 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
B23K26/0604 (EP);
G02B6/262 (US);
B23K26/064 (EP,US);
G02B6/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/34 (US);
G02B27/1006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | MIT STRAHLÜBERLAGERUNGSMECHANISMUS VERSEHENES FASERBÜNDEL | [2021/03] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER BUNDLE PROVIDED WITH BEAM SUPERPOSING MECHANISM | [2021/03] | French: | FAISCEAU DE FIBRES OPTIQUES DOTÉ D'UN MÉCANISME DE SUPERPOSITION DE FAISCEAUX | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2020 | Translation filed | 09.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5953477 (WACH MICHAEL LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 29, lines 44-46, 48-50 * * figures 27A, 27B,68 * [A] 12,13 [Y] 10,11 [I] 8,9; | [YA]WO2013031836 (KONICA MINOLTA ADVANCED LAYERS [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * figure 2 * [A] 1-9,11-13; | [XAY]US2014076870 (HIRANO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0108] * * figure 4 * [A] 12,13[Y] 11 | International search | [YA]JP2005056608 (TOKYO IKEN KK, et al) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0001], [0028], fig. 7 (Family: none) * [A] 1-10, 12-13; | [XYA]JP2008311137 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1-5, 9 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0036], fig. 1, 5 (Family: none) * [Y] 6-8, 11 [A] 10, 12-13; | [A]US2013010353 (BERMAN RICHARD [CA]) [A] 1-13* , entire text, all drawings & EP 2196839 A1 & CN 101900873 A *; | [YA]WO2013058072 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-8, 11 * , fig. 13, 16-17 & US 2014/0076870 A1, fig. 13, 16-17 & EP 2722127 A1 * [A] 1-5, 9-10, 12- 13; | [A]JP2016078049 (AMADA HOLDINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , entire text, all drawings & WO 2016/059949 A1 * | by applicant | JPH03130703 | JPH07168040 | JP2002131588 | JP2005286310 | JP2018044323 |