EP3785328 - COAXIAL CABLE CONNECTORS HAVING PORT GROUNDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPC Broadband, Inc. 6176 East Molloy Road East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARONEY, Richard 4439 Whedon Rd. Camillus, NY 13031 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Peters, Andreas Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19767168.8 | 15.03.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US22641 | Priority number, date | US201862643192P | 15.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862643192 P | US201862656103P | 11.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862656103 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178578 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785328 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, H01R13/622, H01R13/648, H01R13/6583, // H01R13/187, H01R13/652, H01R24/40, H01R103/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H01R13/622 (EP);
H01R13/6583 (EP);
H01R9/0527 (EP);
H01R13/187 (EP);
H01R13/652 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | H01R4/48, H01R9/05, H01R13/11, H01R13/15, H01R13/187, H01R13/193, H01R13/622, H01R13/648, H01R13/652, H01R13/6583 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | KOAXIALKABELVERBINDER MIT ANSCHLUSSERDUNG | [2021/09] | English: | COAXIAL CABLE CONNECTORS HAVING PORT GROUNDING | [2021/09] | French: | CONNECTEURS DE CÂBLE COAXIAL AYANT UNE MISE À LA MASSE D'ORIFICE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/09] | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/09] | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | 15.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 14.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 14.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 14.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6267612 (ARCYKIEWICZ ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * figures 1-4A ** columns 1-6 *; | [Y]US2011230089 (AMIDON JEREMY [US], et al) [Y] 3,10 * figure 100 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0250] *; | [A]US2012171894 (MALLOY ALLEN L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * figures 1-24 * * pages 2-12 *; | [XAY]US2013149896 (HOLLAND MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 2,8,9 * figures 4-11B * * pages 2-4 * [A] 1,4-7,11-13 [Y] 3,10; | [A]US2013323967 (WOOD KENNETH STEVEN [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * figures 1-22 * * pages 3-9 * | International search | [Y]US2011230089 (AMIDON JEREMY [US], et al) [Y] 4 & 14 * ; figure 100; paragraphs [0215 & 0258] *; | [A]US2012171894 (MALLOY ALLEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; abstract; figures 8-108; paragraphs [0036, 0051-0054] *; | [XYA]US2013149896 (HOLLAND MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 2-3, 5, 12-13 & 15 * ; abstract; figure 10; paragraphs [0037, 0057-0059, 0061-0064, 0069]; claim 9 * [Y] 4 & 14 [A] 1, 6-11 & 16-20; | [A]US2013323967 (WOOD KENNETH STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; abstract; figures 7-13; paragraphs [0054, 0057, 0059-0060, 0062, 0066] * | by applicant | US6267612 | US2011230089 | US2012171894 | US8287320 | US2013149896 | US2013323967 |