EP3739913 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, RELATED DEVICES, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jinfang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XIANG, Zhengzheng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SU, Hongjia Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/47] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 19767324.7 | 12.03.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019CN77886 | Priority number, date | CN201810202750 | 12.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810202750 | [2020/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174584 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739913 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3739913 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/40, H04W72/044, H04W72/20, H04W4/70 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04W72/044 (EP);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04W4/40 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/70 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | H04W4/40, H04W72/04 | ||
Former IPC [2020/47] | H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEM | [2020/47] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, RELATED DEVICES, AND SYSTEM | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIFS ASSOCIÉS, ET SYSTÈME | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | Translation filed | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 17.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017079085 (YANG JIN [CN], et al); | [X]WO2017128757 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | US2020305156 [ ] (LIU DEPING [CN], et al) | International search | [A]EP2608597 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [X]CN103580838 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH); | [A]CN103702364 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN104363598 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) |