EP3767291 - ACCELERATOR MASS SPECTROMETRY MEASURING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiang, Shan Institute of Nuclear Physics, China Institute of Atomic Energy, Fangshan District Beijing 102413 / CN | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | JD&P Patent Attorneys Joanna Dargiewicz & Partners ul. Mysliborska 93A/50 03-185 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Dargiewicz, Joanna JD&P Patent Attorneys Joanna Dargiewicz & Partners Ul. Mysliborska 93A/50 03-185 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 19767735.4 | 11.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019CN77683 | Priority number, date | CN201810201635 | 12.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810201635 | [2021/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174548 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767291 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/00, H01J27/18, B01D59/44 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H01J49/0086 (EP,US);
H01J27/18 (EP);
H01J49/105 (US);
B01D59/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | MESSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM FÜR BESCHLEUNIGERMASSENSPEKTROMETRIE | [2021/03] | English: | ACCELERATOR MASS SPECTROMETRY MEASURING METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2021/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE D'ACCÉLÉRATEUR | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2020 | Translation filed | 12.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]CN108987242 (JIANG SHAN) [XP] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0019] - [0026] - [0033] * * claims 1-10 *; | [E]EP3598475 (JIANG SHAN [CN]) [E] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0019] - [0026] - [0033] * * claims 1-10 *; | [XI] - PAUL M ET AL, "AMS of heavy elements with an ECR ion source and the ATLAS linear accelerator", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (200010), vol. 172, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/S0168-583X(00)00279-2, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 688 - 692, XP004238042 [X] 1,3,7-9 * abstract * * page 688, column right, paragraph first - page 691, column left, paragraph first * [I] 2,4-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-583X(00)00279-2 | [I] - WILCKEN K M ET AL, "Positive ion AMS with a single-stage accelerator and an RF-plasma ion source at SUERC", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, (20080316), vol. 266, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.NIMB.2008.03.067, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 2229 - 2232, XP029170045 [I] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nimb.2008.03.067 | [XI] - FREEMAN STEWART P H T ET AL, "Radiocarbon positive-ion mass spectrometry", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, (20150425), vol. 361, doi:10.1016/J.NIMB.2015.04.034, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 229 - 232, XP029288470 [X] 1,3,8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 229, column left, paragraph first - page 231, column right, paragraph first full * [I] 2,4-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nimb.2015.04.034 | International search | [A]CN1362622 (INST OF EARTH ENVIRONMENT CHIN [CN]) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [Y]CN1916622 (UNIV BEIJING [CN]) [Y] 1-9 * description, page 1, line 6 to page 5, line 6, and figures 1-2 *; | [Y]CN101916607 (UNIV BEIJING) [Y] 1-9 * description, paragraphs [0003]-[0022], and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN105301088 (CHINA INST ATOMIC ENERGY) [A] 1-9 * entire document *; | [A]US2017278691 (OKUMURA DAISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-9* entire document * |