EP3764893 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR UTILIZING EMPIRICAL NULL HYPOTHESIS FOR A BIOLOGICAL TIME SERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Persyst Development Corporation 420 Stevens Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Scott B. 420 Stevens Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 02 /
SCHEUER, Mark 420 Stevens Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19768267.7 | 11.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019US21684 | Priority number, date | US201862641947P | 12.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862641947 P | US201916294917 | 07.03.2019 Original published format: US201916294917 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178002 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764893 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/372, A61B5/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B5/7267 (EP,US);
A61B5/374 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP,US);
A61B5/4094 (EP);
G16H50/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | A61B5/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG VON EMPIRISCHER NULLHYPOTHESE FÜR EINE BIOLOGISCHE ZEITREIHE | [2021/03] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR UTILIZING EMPIRICAL NULL HYPOTHESIS FOR A BIOLOGICAL TIME SERIES | [2021/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'UTILISATION D'UNE HYPOTHÈSE NULLE EMPIRIQUE POUR UNE SÉRIE CHRONOLOGIQUE BIOLOGIQUE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007150025 (DILORENZO DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1,2,6,7,9 * * paragraph [0299] *; | [Y]US2008234973 (ALI WALID [US]) [Y] 1,2* paragraphs [0028] - [0039] *; | [XY]WO2013142051 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0105] - [0115] - [ 127] , [0135]; figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0105] - [0115] - [ 127] , [ 135] * [Y] 1,2; | [X]WO2016110804 (BURTON DAVID [AU]) [X] 1,2 * page 84 * * page 180, line 55 - page 182, line 29 *; | [X] - ALI SHAHIDI ZANDI ET AL, "Predicting Epileptic Seizures in Scalp EEG Based on a Variational Bayesian Gaussian Mixture Model of Zero-Crossing Intervals", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20130501), vol. 60, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TBME.2012.2237399, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 1401 - 1413, XP011500383 [X] 1,2 * page 1403, paragraph C.Discriminative Histrogram Bins * * paragraph [IV Discussion and conclusion] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2012.2237399 | [X] - TEMKO ANDRIY ET AL, "Toward a Personalized Real-Time Diagnosis in Neonatal Seizure Detection", IEEE JOURNAL OF TRANSLATIONAL ENGINEERING IN HEALTH AND MEDICINE, (20130501), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/JTEHM.2017.2737992, pages 1 - 14, XP011661883 [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [000E] , [ Appendix B] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JTEHM.2017.2737992 | International search | [A]WO0039337 (ROSETTA INPHARMATICS INC [US])[A] 1-3; | [A]US2006058606 (DAVIS SHAKTI K [US], et al) [A] 1-3; | [XY]US2008234973 (ALI WALID [US]) [X] 1, 3 * , paragraphs [0018] - [0024], [0032], [0043] - [0047] * [Y] 2; | [Y]US2017061217 (CHA MIRIAM [US], et al) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0041], [0042], [0055] - [0061] * |