EP4029135 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THERMAL STRESS OF A POWER SEMICONDUCTOR SWITCH, AN ELECTRICAL CONVERTER UNIT AND AN ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAAKKINEN, Mikko c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 HELSINKI / FI | 02 /
STOLT, Lauri c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 HELSINKI / FI | 03 /
KAUPPINEN, Tuukka c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 HELSINKI / FI | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 19768783.3 | 11.09.2019 | [2022/29] | WO2019EP74213 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021047768 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029135 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/08, H02M7/5395, H02P27/08, H03K17/00, B66B1/00, H02M1/00, H02M1/32 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H02M1/08 (EP);
B66B1/308 (EP,US);
B66B1/285 (US);
H02M7/5395 (EP);
H02P23/14 (EP);
H02P29/032 (EP);
H02P29/68 (EP);
H02P6/34 (EP);
H02M1/0048 (EP);
H02M1/0054 (EP);
H02M1/327 (EP);
H02P6/085 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DES THERMISCHEN STRESSES EINES LEISTUNGSHALBLEITERSCHALTERS, ELEKTRISCHE UMRICHTEREINHEIT UND AUFZUG | [2022/29] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THERMAL STRESS OF A POWER SEMICONDUCTOR SWITCH, AN ELECTRICAL CONVERTER UNIT AND AN ELEVATOR | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE CONTRAINTE THERMIQUE D'UN COMMUTATEUR À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE PUISSANCE, UNITÉ CONVERTISSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET ASCENSEUR | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 05.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002125362 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [Y]US2011056771 (OHYA HIROAKI [JP], et al) |