EP3853163 - SYSTEM FOR CONVEYING PASSENGERS, METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE OPERATION OF A SYSTEM FOR CONVEYING PASSENGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEAU, Philippe Giessereistrasse 16 8005 Zürich / CH | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19768859.1 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019EP75054 | Priority number, date | EP20180195261 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18195261 | [2021/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058352 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853163 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B1/34, B66B25/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
B66B5/0006 (EP);
B66B5/0018 (US);
B66B1/34 (EP);
B66B1/3461 (US);
B66B25/00 (EP);
B66B25/006 (US);
Y02B50/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON PERSONEN, VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES BETRIEBS DES SYSTEMS ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON PERSONEN | [2021/30] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONVEYING PASSENGERS, METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE OPERATION OF A SYSTEM FOR CONVEYING PASSENGERS | [2021/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE PERSONNES ET PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION DE SON FONCTIONNEMENT | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010224452 (JOKINEN RISTO [FI]) [X] 1,3,6-8,12,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0042] , [0 43] *; | [XAI]US2014166407 (SONNENMOSER ASTRID [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-8,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] - [0071] * [A] 14 [I] 5,9-11,13; | [XDAI]WO2017016876 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [XD] 1,3,4,6-10,12,13,15 * abstract * * page 13, line 19 - page 21, line 16 * [A] 2,14 [I] 5,11 | by applicant | WO2017016876 |