EP3850594 - VALUABLE DOCUMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/29] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KECHT, Johann Beblostraße 3 81677 München / DE | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19769383.1 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP25302 | Priority number, date | DE20181007289 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018007289 | [2021/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020052812 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850594 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/12, B42D25/36, B42D25/382, B42D25/387, G07D7/1205, G07D7/121 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G07D7/12 (EP);
B42D25/382 (EP,US);
C09K11/7771 (EP);
C09K11/7774 (EP);
C09K11/7776 (EP);
C09K11/7777 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (US);
G01N21/95607 (US);
G07D7/1205 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | WERTDOKUMENTSYSTEM | [2021/29] | English: | VALUABLE DOCUMENT SYSTEM | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DOCUMENTS DE VALEUR | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006024530 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-13,17 * Seite 11-25, 35 * [I] 2,8,14-16,18,19; | [A]US2010026991 (HEER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [A] 14-16* paragraph [0034] * | by applicant | EP2271504 | EP2512821 | US9046486 |