EP3843772 - DECOY POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALX Oncology Inc. 323 Allerton Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states ALX Oncology Inc. 323 Allerton Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states ALX Oncology Inc. 866 Malcolm Road, Suite 100 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIM, Bang Janet c/o ALX ONCOLOGY INC. 866 Malcolm Road, Suite 100 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
PONS, Jaume c/o ALX ONCOLOGY INC. 866 Malcolm Road, Suite 100 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19770221.0 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US48921 | Priority number, date | US201862725977P | 31.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862725977 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020047326 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3843772 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
C07K14/70503 (US);
C07K14/55 (US);
C07K14/70596 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/40 (US);
C07K2317/71 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | 04.03.2021 | ME | 04.03.2021 | Validation states | KH | 04.03.2021 | MA | 04.03.2021 | MD | 04.03.2021 | TN | 04.03.2021 | Title | German: | DECOY-POLYPEPTIDE | [2021/27] | English: | DECOY POLYPEPTIDES | [2021/27] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES LEURRES | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 04.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016023040 (ALEXO THERAPEUTICS INTERNAT [US]) [Y] 1-26,73-140 * page 17, line 13 - line 33 * * page 52, line 11 - line 34 *; | [Y]WO2016187226 (AB INITIO BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-26,73-140* page 1 - page 9 * | by applicant | US4179337 | US4301144 | US4496689 | US4640835 | US4670417 | US4791192 | WO9411026 | WO2007055916 | WO2007117505 | US2010266505 | WO2013109752 | WO2014094122 | WO2016023040 | WO2017027422 | - MAJETI et al., Cell, (20090000), vol. 138, no. 2, pages 286 - 99 | - CHAO et al., Cell, (20100000), vol. 142, no. 5, pages 699 - 713 | - ZHANG et al., PLoS ONE, (20160000), vol. 11, no. 4, page e015355 | - WEISKOPF et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 341, no. 6141, pages 88 - 91 | - HATHERLEY et al., Molecular Cell, (20080000), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 266 - 77 | - BARCLAY et al., Nat. Rev. Immunol., (20060000), vol. 6, page 457 | - VAN BEEK et al., J. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 175, page 7781 | - PICCIO et al., Blood, (20050000), vol. 105, page 2421 | - "Uniprot", Database accession no. Q5TFQ8 | - CUNNINGHAM et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - SMITH et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - MARTIN et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 255, pages 192 - 194 | - CANFIELDMORRISON, J. Exp. Med., (19910000), vol. 173, page 1483 | - DUNCAN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, page 563 | - TAO et al., J. Exp. Med., (19930000), vol. 178, page 661 | - ARMOUR KL. et al., Eur J Immunol., (19990000), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 2613 - 24 | - SHIELDS R L. et al., JBiol Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, no. 9, pages 6591 - 604 | - HAMILTON et al., Science, (20060000), vol. 313, page 1441 | - KANDA, J. Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 130, page 300 | - KITAGAWA et al., J. Biol.Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, no. 27, page 17872 | - UJITA-LEE et al., J. Biol.Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, no. 23, page 13848 | - IMAI-NISHIYA et al., BMC Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 7, page 84 | - SHOJ-HOSAKA et al., J. Biochem., (20060000), vol. 140, page 777 | - SCHWARZE et al., Science, (19990000), vol. 285, pages 1569 - 72 | - FIELD et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, pages 2159 - 2165 | - EVAN et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 3610 - 3616 | - PABORSKY et al., Protein Eng., (19900000), vol. 3, pages 547 - 553 | - HOPP et al., BioTechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 1204 - 1210 | - SKINNER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19910000), vol. 266, pages 15163 - 15166 | - LUTZ-FREYERMUTH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 6393 - 6397 | - VITETTA et al., Science, (19870000), vol. 238, page 1098 | - DENARDO et al., Clin Cancer Res., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 2483 - 90 | - PETERSON et al., Bioconjug. Chem., (19990000), vol. 10, pages 553 - 557 | - ZIMMERMAN et al., Nucl. Med. Biol., (19990000), vol. 26, pages 943 - 50 | - "Monoclonal Antibodies For Immunotargeting Of Drugs In Cancer Therapy", AMON et al., Monoclonal Antibodies And Cancer Therapy, Alan R. Liss, Inc., (19850000), pages 243 - 56 | - "Antibodies For Drug Delivery", HELLSTROM et al., Controlled Drug Delivery, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19870000), pages 623 - 53 | - "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE et al., Monoclonal Antibodies 84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (19850000), pages 475 - 506 | - "Analysis, Results, And Future Prospective Of The Therapeutic Use Of Radio labeled Antibody In Cancer Therapy", Monoclonal Antibodies For Cancer Detection And Therapy, Academic Press, (19850000), pages 303 - 16 | - THORPE et al., Immunol. Rev., (19820000), vol. 62, pages 119 - 58 | - LINDMARK et al., J. Immunol. Meth., (19830000), vol. 62, pages 79 - 13 | - MONFARDINI, C. et al., Bioconjugate Chem, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 62 - 69 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Viral., (19770000), vol. 36, page 59 | - URLAUB et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216 | - MATHER, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER et al., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - GUSS et al., EMBO J., (19860000), vol. 5, page 15671575 | - BRAVMAN et al., Anal. Biochem., (20060000), vol. 358, pages 281 - 288 |