EP3769308 - SUB-THRESHOLD VOLTAGE LEAKAGE CURRENT TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, P.O. Box 6, M/S 507 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANTINI, Paolo Via Pellizzari 32 20871 Vimercate / IT | 02 /
AMATO, Paolo Via E. Bignamini 2/D 24047 Treviglio / IT | 03 /
SFORZIN, Marco Via Santa Caterina Da Siena 9 20063 Cernusco Sul Naviglio / IT | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19770332.5 | 11.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US21581 | Priority number, date | US201815928831 | 22.03.2018 Original published format: US201815928831 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019182785 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769308 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/12, G11C16/04, G11C16/26 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
G11C16/3495 (EP);
G11C16/12 (KR);
G11C7/06 (US);
G11C13/0033 (EP);
G11C16/0483 (KR);
G11C16/26 (EP,KR,US);
G11C29/021 (EP);
G11C29/028 (EP);
G11C13/004 (EP,US);
G11C13/0069 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C2029/5006 (EP);
G11C2213/31 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG VON UNTERSCHWELLENWERT-SPANNUNGSLECKSTROM | [2021/04] | English: | SUB-THRESHOLD VOLTAGE LEAKAGE CURRENT TRACKING | [2021/04] | French: | SUIVI DE COURANT DE FUITE DE TENSION DE SOUS-SEUIL | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2016125940 (KANG SEOK JOON [KR]) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1A,2 * [A] 4-15; | [A]US2017358346 (ZHANG FAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0034] * | International search | [Y]US2001028588 (YAMADA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-11,15,20 * See paragraphs [0072], [0077], [0081]-[0082]; and figures 2, 4-5. *; | [A]US2006181915 (OH HYUNG-ROK [KR], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0044]; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2010195386 (HUH HWANG [KR]) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0047]; and figures 2A-2B. *; | [A]US2013058167 (WADA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-21* See paragraphs [0032]-[0038]; and figures 1-2. *; | [YX]US2015071000 (NAMAI YUZURU [JP], et al) [Y] 10-11,15,20 * See paragraphs [0029], [0033], [0037], [0040], [0057], [0061], [0074], [0079], [0098]; claims 1, 8, 13; and figures 1, 3-4, 10. * [X] 1-9,12-14,16-19,21 | by applicant | US2016125940 | US2017358346 |