EP3768258 - COMBINATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEI Pharma, Inc. 11455 El Camino Real, Suite 250 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLD, Daniel P. 11455 El Camino Real, Suite 250 San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2021/04] | 01 /
GOLD, Daniel P. 3611 Valley Centre Drive Suite 500 San Diego, California 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19770484.4 | 20.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US23172 | Priority number, date | US201862646314P | 21.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862646314 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183226 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768258 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5377, A61P35/02, A61K31/454 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/5025 (IL);
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K31/519 (IL,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/04] | A61K31/4184, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | 03.09.2020 | ME | 03.09.2020 | Validation states | KH | 03.09.2020 | MA | 03.09.2020 | MD | 03.09.2020 | TN | 03.09.2020 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE | [2021/04] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY | [2021/04] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - TAM CONSTANTINE S ET AL, "Safety and Activity of the Highly Specific BTK Inhibitor BGB-3111 in Patients with Indolent and Aggressive Non Hodgkin's Lymphoma", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20171208), vol. 130, doi:10.1182/BLOOD.V130.SUPPL_1.152.152, ISSN 0006-4971, page 152, XP086631490 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V130.Suppl_1.152.152 | [Y] - ZHU JUN ET AL, "BGB-3111, a Highly Specific BTK Inhibitor, Is Well Tolerated and Highly Active in Chinese Patients with Relapsed/Refractory B-Cell Malignancies: Initial Report of a Phase 1 Trial in China", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20171208), vol. 130, doi:10.1182/BLOOD.V130.SUPPL_1.5347.5347, ISSN 0006-4971, page 5347, XP086634866 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V130.Suppl_1.5347.5347 | [T] - Pubchem, "Zanubrutinib | C27H29N5O3 - PubChem", (20211113), URL: https://pubchem.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/compound/Zanubrutinib, (20211115), XP055861381 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US9056852 (BROWN S DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7, 45-61 * col 103, ln 1 to col 109, In 65; col 129, In 14-30; col 114, In 64 to col 115, In 3; col 132, In 9-28; col 133, In 4-16; col 135, In 30-45; col 141, In 10-25; *; | [Y]US2017136014 (HAMDY AHMED [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 7, 45-61 * para [0013], [0047], [0167]-[0168], [0296], [0299], [0809], [1822]-[1827] *; | [A]US2017231995 (HAMDY AHMED [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 7, 45-61* Entire Document *; | [A]US2017266191 (HAMDY AHMED [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 7, 45-61 * Entire Document *; | [A] - "BGB-3111", PUBCHEM Substance, (20170823), Database accession no. 340590222, URL: NCBI, XP055637342 [A] 1-5, 7, 45-61 * ; pg 2 * |