EP3769028 - VIEWING OPTIC WITH A BASE HAVING A LIGHT MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sheltered Wings, Inc. D/b/a/ Vortex Optics One Vortex Drive Barneveld, WI 53507 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMILTON, David M. One Vortex Drive Barneveld, Wisconsin 53507 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19770547.8 | 20.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US23182 | Priority number, date | US201862645584P | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645584 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183230 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769028 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3769028 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F41G1/34, G02B23/14, G02B27/34, F41G1/38, G02B23/16, G02B7/04 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
F41G1/38 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B23/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F41G1/30 (IL,KR,US);
F41G11/003 (IL,KR,US);
F41G3/065 (IL,KR,US);
F41G3/08 (IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | F41G1/34, G02B23/14, G02B27/34, F41G1/38 | ||
Former IPC [2021/04] | F41G1/34, G02B23/14, G02B27/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHTOPTIK MIT EINEM SOCKEL MIT EINEM LICHTMODUL | [2023/33] | English: | VIEWING OPTIC WITH A BASE HAVING A LIGHT MODULE | [2021/04] | French: | OPTIQUE DE VISUALISATION AVEC UNE BASE AYANT UN MODULE LUMINEUX | [2021/04] |
Former [2021/04] | BETRACHTUNGSOPTIK MIT EINEM SOCKEL MIT EINEM LICHTMODUL | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2649927 (SIEMENS AG ALBIS); | [XI]DE8702309U ; | [XI]EP0886163 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]DE29904303U (HENSOLDT & SOEHNE OPTIK [DE]); | [A]US2011228395 (KAMMANS SIGRUN [DE]) | International search | [Y]US4627171 (DUDNEY MORRIS S [US]); | [A]US6721095 (HUBER JEFF [US]); | [Y]US7804643 (MENGES DIETMAR [AT], et al); | [YA]US2015276346 (HAMILTON DAVID M [US], et al); | [A]US9631896 (SCROGGINS C MICHAEL [US]); | [XY]US2017138698 (YORK ANDREW W [US], et al); | [A]US2018010887 (VANBECELAERE JACOB C [US]); | [PA]US2018224244 (HAVENS CALEN [US], et al) | by applicant | DE8702309U | EP0886163 |