EP3769884 - CHUCK CLAW REPLACEMENT HAND, CHUCK CLAW AUTOMATIC REPLACEMENT METHOD, AND CLAW AUTOMATIC REPLACEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howa Machinery, Ltd. 1900-1, Sukaguchi Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8601 / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAOSA Hiroshi c/o Howa Machinery, Ltd., 1900-1, Sukaguchi Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8601 / JP | 02 /
KAWAWAKI Kazuya c/o Howa Machinery, Ltd., 1900-1, Sukaguchi Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8601 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19770913.2 | 15.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019JP10805 | Priority number, date | JP20180051296 | 19.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018051296 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181779 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769884 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/39 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B23B31/39 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/16 (KR);
B23B2260/128 (EP,KR);
Y10T483/171 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | HAND ZUM AUSWECHSELN EINER SPANNFUTTERKLAUE, VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN AUSWECHSELN EINER SPANNFUTTERKLAUE UND SYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN AUSWECHSELN EINER KLAUE | [2021/04] | English: | CHUCK CLAW REPLACEMENT HAND, CHUCK CLAW AUTOMATIC REPLACEMENT METHOD, AND CLAW AUTOMATIC REPLACEMENT SYSTEM | [2021/04] | French: | MAIN DE REMPLACEMENT DE GRIFFE DE MANDRIN, PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE GRIFFE DE MANDRIN, ET SYSTÈME DE REMPLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE GRIFFE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2020 | Translation filed | 15.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2065110 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0023] , [0036] , [0 44]; figures 1,3,5,8 * [A] 2-4; | [XDA]JP2014237212 (KITAGAWA IRON WORKS CO) [XD] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figures 3-6 *[A] 2-4 | International search | [A]JPS5947106 (HITACHI SEIKI KK) [A] 2 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS61103710 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1 * (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS6357128 (CANON KK) [Y] 1, 5-6 * , page 2, upper right column, line 11 to page 3, upper left column, line 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0366087B (HOWA MACHINERY, LTD.) [A] 1 * (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001334485 (SAKURAI SEIGI KK) [Y] 1, 5-6 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0029], [0037] (Family: none) *; | [A]US2011115171 (VAN DE VOSSE GERHARDUS [NL], et al) [A] 1 * & EP 2322302 A1 *; | [YA]JP2014237212 (KITAGAWA IRON WORKS CO) [Y] 1, 5-6 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0023] (Family: none) * [A] 2-4; | [Y]JP2015003361 (AZBIL CORP) [Y] 1, 5-6 * , paragraph [0002] (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2018176419 (HOWA MACHINERY LTD) [PA] 1* (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0699303 | JP4955522B |