EP3770126 - FURNACE GAS FEEDING DEVICE, OPTICAL FIBER PRODUCTION DEVICE, AND OPTICAL FIBER PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Satoshi c/o Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
TSUNEISHI, Katsuyuki c/o Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19771167.4 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019JP12189 | Priority number, date | JP20180057227 | 23.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018057227 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019182136 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770126 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/027 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C03B37/029 (EP,US);
C03B37/0256 (KR,RU);
C03B37/027 (KR,RU);
C03B2205/81 (EP);
C03B2205/91 (US);
C03B2205/98 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON OFENGAS, VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHEN FASER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHEN FASER | [2021/04] | English: | FURNACE GAS FEEDING DEVICE, OPTICAL FIBER PRODUCTION DEVICE, AND OPTICAL FIBER PRODUCTION METHOD | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION DE GAZ DE FOUR, DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRE OPTIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2020 | Translation filed | 21.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4988374 (HARDING IAN D [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * column 2, lines 48-66; figure 1 * [I] 2; | [A]US2005115278 (MATTILA TIMO [FI]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *; | [A]CN203212462U (JIANGSU FASTEN PHOTONICS CO LTD) [A] 3* paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JPS52119546U (FUJIKURA CABLE LTD.) [X] 1-3, 5, 6* , specification, page 2, line 14 to page 4, line 2 from the bottom, fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) *; | [X]JPH01192741 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-6 * , page 3, lower right column, line 8 to page 5, lower left column, line 10, fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [X]US2004050112 (BAE SANG-JOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-3, 5, 6 * , abstract, paragraphs [0036]-[0039], fig. 1, 2 & KR 10-2004-0020648 A * | by applicant | JPS62260731 | JP2007070189 | JP2012056815 | JP2018057227 |