EP3769006 - OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINKO, Kari Myllytie 3 A 9 00140 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Shingo 920-71 Mogusa Hino-shi Tokyo, 191--0033 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19771669.9 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019IB52345 | Priority number, date | US201862646461P | 22.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862646461 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019180676 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769006 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, F21V8/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/0035 (EP,KR);
G02B6/0036 (EP,US);
G02B5/0247 (US);
G02B6/0023 (US);
G02B6/0031 (EP,US);
G02B6/0043 (US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0063 (US);
G02B6/0065 (KR);
G02B6/002 (US);
G02B6/4243 (US);
G02B6/4259 (US);
G09F2013/1804 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | F21S2/00, F21V8/00, F21Y103/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y115/15, F21Y115/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/04] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 30.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003128538 (SHINOHARA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [XY]EP1988333 (QUALCOMM MEMS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]US2011244187 (RINKO KARI J [FI]); | [X]US2013315534 (HUANG JIANDONG [US], et al); | [X]US2014140091 (VASYLYEV SERGIY VICTOROVICH [US]) | International search | [Y]US2003128538 (SHINOHARA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009276713 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [YA]US2011244187 (RINKO KARI J [FI]); | [XY]JP2015213051 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) | by applicant | EP1988333 | US2011244187 | US2018088270 |