EP3768820 - A METHOD FOR LYOPHILIZING LIVE VACCINE STRAINS OF FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/04] | <SMALLCAPS/> FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS A METHOD FOR LYOPHILIZING LIVE VACCINE STRAINS OF | ||
[2022/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONLAN, Wayne 1152 Bordeau Grove Ottawa, Ontario K1C 2M7 / CA | 02 /
MCRAE, Kevan 200 Pretoria Avenue, Apt. A7 Ottawa, Ontario K1S 1X2 / CA | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19772499.0 | 20.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019CA50340 | Priority number, date | US201862645409P | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645409 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178687 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768820 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3768820 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/04, A61K39/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/42, A61K9/19, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C12N1/20, A61K39/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61K39/0208 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N1/04 (EP);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
C12N2500/34 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | C12N1/04, A61K39/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/42, A61K9/19, A61P31/04, A61P37/04, C12N1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LYOPHILISIERUNG VON LEBENDVAKZIN-STÄMMEN VON FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS | [2021/04] | English: | A METHOD FOR LYOPHILIZING LIVE VACCINE STRAINS OF FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS | [2022/32] | French: | FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS LYOPHILISATION DE SOUCHES VACCINALES VIVANTE CONTRE | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/04] | <SMALLCAPS/> FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS A METHOD FOR LYOPHILIZING LIVE VACCINE STRAINS OF | ||
Former [2021/04] | <SMALLCAPS/> FRANCISELLA TULARENSIS PROC& XC9;D& XC9; DE LYOPHILISATION DE SOUCHES VACCINALES VIVANTE CONTRE | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | IE | 20.03.2023 | LU | 20.03.2023 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0029018 (CHANGCHUN INST OF BIOLOG PRODU [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 4, 9 *; | [A]EP1123710 (CHANGCHUN INST OF BIOLOG PRODU [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012]; example 2; claim 4 *; | [A]WO2010124428 (CHANGCHUN BCHT BIOTECHNOLOGY C [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018027075 (TAKEDA VACCINES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 * | International search | [A]US2004044393 (YARDEN ORIT [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * , Page 1, paragraph [0015] - page 11, paragraph [0211]; figures 1-11. *; | [A]US2007100414 (LICATA DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , Page 1, paragraph [0012] - page 18, paragraph [0212]; figures 1 - 26. *; | [A]WO2014115306 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* , Abstract, Figures. *; | [A]ES2535814T (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * , Page 3, line 34 - page 10, line 3; figures 1 - 7. *; | [A]US2016175125 (BRADY PETER [IE], et al) [A] 1-15 * , Page 1, paragraph [0009] - page 8, paragraph [0082]; figures 1 - 25. * | [Y]WO2010124377 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA], et al) [Y] 46-54 and 56 *whole document*; | [A] - (20080000), pages 117 - 137, URL: WWW.MEDIGRAPHIC.COM/PDFS/NEUMO/NT-008/NT083C.PDF [A] 1-15 * . * | [A] - (20120000), pages 27 - 43, URL: WWW.ZAGUAN.UNIZAR.ES/RECORD/7078/FILES/TESIS-2012-050.PDF [A] 1-15 * . * | [A] - (20170201), pages 1 - 105, URL: WWW.OA.UPM.ES/46457/1/IFGSONIACALVOSANCHEZ.PDF [A] 1-15 * . * | [Y] - EIGELSBACH, H.T. et al., "Prophylactic effectiveness of live and killed tularemia vaccines", J. Immunol., (19610000), vol. 87, no. 4, ISSN 0022-7767, pages 415 - 425, XP009078420 [Y] 46-54 and 56 *pages 415-416 and 419-420; Table III* | [A] - OHTAKE, S. et al., "Formulation and stabilization of Francisella tularensis live vaccine strain", J. Pharm. Sci., (20110800), vol. 100, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 3076 - 3087, XP055639487 [A] 1-62 *Table 6; Fig. 4a* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.22563 | [A] - MAROHN, M.E. et al., "Live attenuated tularemia vaccines: recent developments and future goals", Vaccine, (20130802), vol. 31, no. 35, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3485 - 3491, XP028683957 [A] 1-62 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2013.05.096 | [A] - CONLAN, J.W. et al., "Differential ability of novel attenuated targeted deletion mutants of Francisella tularensis subspecies tularensis strain SCHU S4 to protect mice against aerosol challenge with virulent bacteria: effects of host background and route of immunization", Vaccine, (20100217), vol. 28, no. 7, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1824 - 1831, XP026884519 [A] 1-62 *whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.12.001 |