EP3769464 - DYNAMIC DOMAIN KEY EXCHANGE FOR AUTHENTICATED DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mocana Corporation 1735 North First Street, No 306 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Srinivas 19930 Olivewood Street, Unit C Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
GUPTA, Atul 1602 Hummingbird Lane Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 03 /
MALIBIRADAR, Pramod 1055 Gaviota Terrace Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 04 /
UCHIL, Shreya 151 El Camino Real, Unit 219 Millbrae, California 94030 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19772626.8 | 19.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US22874 | Priority number, date | US201862645263P | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645263 P | US201816138030 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: US201816138030 | US201916277177 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: US201916277177 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183032 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769464 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3769464 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/069, H04W12/00, H04W4/06, H04W12/50, H04W12/108, H04W4/46, H04W12/0471, H04W12/0433, H04L9/32, H04L9/08, H04W12/0431, H04L9/40 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04L9/0833 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04L9/0825 (IL,KR,US);
H04L63/065 (EP,IL,US);
H04L67/12 (IL,US);
H04L9/0866 (KR);
H04L9/0891 (KR);
H04L9/3247 (EP,IL,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04L9/3268 (IL,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,IL,US);
H04W12/009 (EP);
H04W12/0431 (EP);
H04W12/0433 (EP,US);
H04W12/0471 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (IL,US);
H04W12/069 (EP);
H04W12/108 (EP,US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,IL,US);
H04W4/40 (IL,US);
H04W4/46 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H04W12/069, H04W12/0431, H04L9/08, H04L9/32, H04W12/0433, H04W12/0471, H04W4/46, H04L29/06, H04W12/108, H04W12/50, H04W4/06, H04W12/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/04] | H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHER DOMÄNENSCHLÜSSELAUSTAUSCH FÜR AUTHENTIFIZIERTE KOMMUNIKATION VON VORRICHTUNG ZU VORRICHTUNG | [2021/04] | English: | DYNAMIC DOMAIN KEY EXCHANGE FOR AUTHENTICATED DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATIONS | [2021/04] | French: | ÉCHANGE DE CLÉ DE DOMAINE DYNAMIQUE POUR COMMUNICATIONS DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF AUTHENTIFIÉES | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 12.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104683112B ; | [A]KR20170134804 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]); | [A]US2018006829 (KRAVITZ DAVID W [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2015052352 (DOLEV SHLOMI [IL], et al); | [A]US2016285863 (CANAVOR DARREN ERNEST [US], et al); | [A]US2017346640 (SMITH NED M [US], et al); | [A]US2018006829 (KRAVITZ DAVID W [US], et al); |