EP3850380 - ELECTRICAL POWER CABLE MONITORING DEVICE USING LOW SIDE ELECTRODE AND EARTH GROUND SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | For all designated states Connected Intelligence Systems Ltd. St. Meir Ariel 6 Intergrama Building 4250364 Netanya / IL | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/29] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
For all designated states Connected Intelligence Systems Ltd. Industrial Park Intergama Building 4059300 Netanya / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNDEL, Douglas B. P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
DORON, Eyal 1 Tapuz Str. 30889 Caesarea / IL | 03 /
EMBON, Lior 41 Ha'Seora St. 30500 Binyamina / IL | 04 /
BLICH, Udi Givat Haim 38935 Ichud / IL | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19772935.3 | 05.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US49801 | Priority number, date | US201862729325P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729325 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055666 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850380 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/12, G01R15/06, G01R15/16 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G01R31/1272 (EP,US);
G01R31/58 (EP,US);
G01K7/42 (US);
G01R15/06 (EP);
G01R15/16 (EP);
G01R31/1227 (EP);
G01R31/66 (EP);
H01B9/006 (US);
H02G15/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | STROMKABELÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VON NIEDERSEITENELEKTRODE UND ERDUNGSTRENNUNG | [2021/29] | English: | ELECTRICAL POWER CABLE MONITORING DEVICE USING LOW SIDE ELECTRODE AND EARTH GROUND SEPARATION | [2021/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE CÂBLE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE UTILISANT UNE ÉLECTRODE CÔTÉ BASSE TENSION ET UNE SÉPARATION DE MASSE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 10.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPS60256068 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,3,5,11 * figures 1-2 * [I] 2; | [I]DE3702735 (TROTT JOSEF DIPL ING [DE]) [I] 1,3,5 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 6 *; | [A]US5892430 (WIESMAN RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 2,4 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2014368215 (HOFFMAN GARY R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,11 * figures 1A, 3, 3A,4 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 2; | [A]WO2015179102 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2016137424 (GE AVIATION SYSTEMS LLC [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [XI]WO2016187090 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,3,5,11 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 2 - line 10 * * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 22 * [I] 2; | [I]EP3182428 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [I] 1,3,5 * figures 6,12 * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]US2017222420 (DHLAMINI SIZWE MAGIYA [ZA]) [A] 2* the whole document * |