EP4022077 - CANNABINOID CONCENTRATE AND ISOLATE, METHOD OF OBTAINING THE SAME AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herbolea Biotech S.p.A. Via Luciano Lama, 9/11 50019 Sesto Fiorentino / IT | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURINI DEL GRECO, Giovanni Via Carducci, 16 50121 FIRENZE / IT | 02 /
VENTURINI DEL GRECO, Lorenzo Via Carducci, 16 50121 Firenze / IT | 03 /
DECORTI, Deborha Via Brazzano, 24 34071 Cormons / IT | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Zaccaro, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Masala, Gian Tomaso, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19772984.1 | 27.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019EP72843 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037343 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022077 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/22, C12P17/06, A61K31/352 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
C12P7/22 (EP,IL);
A61K31/352 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,IL);
A61K31/192 (EP,IL,US);
B01D3/10 (US);
C12P17/06 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Validation states | MA | 25.03.2022 | Title | German: | CANNABINOID-KONZENTRAT UND ISOLAT, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2022/27] | English: | CANNABINOID CONCENTRATE AND ISOLATE, METHOD OF OBTAINING THE SAME AND USE THEREOF | [2022/27] | French: | CONCENTRÉ ET ISOLAT DE CANNABINOÏDES, PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION ET UTILISATION | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 25.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2015070167 (WERC SHOP LLC [US]); | [AD]WO2018130682 (HERBOLEA S R L [IT]); | [A]EP3461545 (BIONORICA ETHICS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US6403126 | GB2393182 | WO2015070167 | US9186386 | US9340475 | WO2016153347 | WO2017025712 | WO2018130682 | WO2019012267 |