EP3852758 - COMBINATIONS OF TGFB INHIBITORS AND CDK INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERNASETTI, Flavia Mercer c/o Pfizer Inc. 10777 Science Center Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19773187.0 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019IB57776 | Priority number, date | US201862732618P | 18.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862732618 P | US201862733120P | 19.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862733120 P | US201962890168P | 22.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890168 P | US201962892771P | 28.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962892771 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058820 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852758 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/455, A61K31/519, A61K31/565, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON TGFB-INHIBITOREN UND CDK-INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS | [2021/30] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF TGFB INHIBITORS AND CDK INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER | [2021/30] | French: | COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEURS DE TGFB ET D'INHIBITEURS DE CDK POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 19.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2015103355 (MEDIVATION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [YD] 1-8,13-22 * abstract * * paragraph [[0[108] [0109]] *; | [Y]WO2017160990 (MERRIMACK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 5,6,9,10,16-22 * abstract * * page 60, lines 22-23 *; | [YD]WO2018033815 (PFIZER [US]) [YD] 1-8,13-22 * claims 1, 21-22 *; | [YD] - CRISTOFANILLI MASSIMO ET AL, "Fulvestrant plus palbociclib versus fulvestrant plus placebo for treatment of hormone-receptor-positive, HER2-negative metastatic breast cancer that progressed on previous endocrine therapy (PALOMA-3): final analysis of the multicentre, double-blind, phase 3 randomised controlled trial", THE LANCET ONCOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160303), vol. 17, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(15)00613-0, ISSN 1470-2045, pages 425 - 439, XP029483315 [YD] 5,6,9,10,16-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(15)00613-0 | [YD] - A. DEMICHELE ET AL, "CDK 4/6 Inhibitor Palbociclib (PD0332991) in Rb+ Advanced Breast Cancer: Phase II Activity, Safety, and Predictive Biomarker Assessment", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20150301), vol. 21, no. 5, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-2258, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 995 - 1001, XP055317380 [YD] 5,6,9,10,16-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-2258 | by applicant | WO03062236 | WO2005005426 | US6936612 | US7208489 | US7345171 | WO2008032157 | US7456168 | US7781583 | US7863278 | WO2014128588 | WO2015103355 | WO2018033815 | US10030004 | - MASSAGUE J., "TGFbeta in Cancer", Cell, (20080000), vol. 134, no. 2, pages 215 - 30 | - NEUZILLET CTIJERAS-RABALLAND ACOHEN R et al., "Targeting the TGFβ pathway for cancer therapy", Pharmacol Ther, (20150000), vol. 147, doi:doi:10.1016/j.pharmthera.2014.11.001, pages 22 - 31, XP029196208 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pharmthera.2014.11.001 | - PRINCIPE DRDOLL JABAUER J et al., "TGF-β: duality of function between tumor prevention and carcinogenesis", J Natl Cancer Inst, (20140000), vol. 106, no. 2, page djt369 | - MU YGUDEY SKLANDSTROM M, "Non-Smad signaling pathways", Cell Tissue Res, (20120000), vol. 347, no. 1, pages 11 - 20 | - AKALAY IJANJI BHASMIM M et al., "Epithelial-to-mesenchymal transition and autophagy induction in breast carcinoma promote escape from T-cell-mediated lysis", Cancer Res, (20130000), vol. 73, no. 8, pages 2418 - 27 | - COLAK STEN DIJKE P, "Targeting TGF-β signaling in cancer", Trends in Cancer, (20170000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 56 - 71 | - MAK MPTONG PDIAO L et al., "A Patient-Derived, Pan-Cancer EMT Signature Identifies Global Molecular Alterations and Immune Target Enrichment Following Epithelial-to-Mesenchymal Transition", Clin Cancer Res, (20160000), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 609 - 20 | - HEGDE PSKARANIKAS VEVERS S, "The Where, the When, and the How of Immune Monitoring for Cancer Immunotherapies in the Era of Checkpoint Inhibition", Clin Cancer Res, (20160000), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 1865 - 74 | - JOHNSON DGWALKER CL., "Cyclins and Cell Cycle Checkpoints", Annu. Rev. Pharmacol. Toxicol., (19990000), vol. 39, pages 295 - 312 | - MORGAN DO, "Cyclin-dependent kinases: engines, clocks, and microprocessors", Annu. Rev. Cell. Dev. Biol., (19970000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.cellbio.13.1.261, pages 261 - 291, XP008121072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.cellbio.13.1.261 | - CORDON-CARDO C., "Mutations of cell cycle regulators: biological and clinical implications for human neoplasia", Am. J. Pathol., (19950000), vol. 147, pages 545 - 560, XP008005329 | - KARP JEBRODER S., "Molecular foundations of cancer: new targets for intervention", Nat. Med., (19950000), vol. 1, pages 309 - 320 | - HALL MPETERS G, "Genetic alterations of cyclins, cyclin-dependent kinases, and Cdk inhibitors in human cancer", Adv. Cancer Res., (19960000), vol. 68, pages 67 - 108 | - SMALLEY et al., "Identification of a novel subgroup of melanomas with KIT/cyclin-dependent kinase-4 overexpression", Cancer Res, (20080000), vol. 68, pages 5743 - 52 | - O'LEARY et al., "Treating cancer with selective CDK4/6 inhbitors", Nature Reviews, (20160000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1038/nrclinonc.2016.26, pages 417 - 430, XP055581045 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrclinonc.2016.26 | - ASGHAR et al., "The history and future of targeting cyclin-dependent kinases in cancer therapy", Nat. Rev. Drug. Discov., (20150000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 130 - 146 | - KEYOMARSI et al., "Cyclin E and survival in patients with breast cancer", N Engl J Med., (20020000), vol. 347, pages 1566 - 75 | - CALDON et al., "Cyclin E2 overexpression is associated with endocrine resistance but not insensitivity to CDK2 inhibition in human breast cancer cells", Mol. Cancer Ther., (20120000), vol. 11, pages 1488 - 99 | - HERRERA-ABREU et al., "Early Adaptation and Acquired Resistance to CDK4/6 Inhibition in Estrogen Receptor-Positive Breast Cancer", Cancer Res., (20160000), vol. 76, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-15-0728, pages 2301 - 2313, XP055506969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-15-0728 | - SCALTRITI et al., "Cyclin E amplification/overexpression is a mechanism of trastuzumab resistance in HER2+ breast cancer patients", Proc Natl Acad Sci., (20110000), vol. 108, pages 3761 - 6 | - ELSAWAFSINN, "Triple Negative Breast Cancer: Clinical and Histological Correlations", Breast Care, (20110000), vol. 6, pages 273 - 278 | - ALEXANDER et al., "Cyclin E overexpression as a biomarker for combination treatment strategies in inflammatory breast cancer", Oncotarget, (20170000), vol. 8, pages 14897 - 14911 | - WHO Drug Information, (20130000), vol. 27, no. 2, page 172 | - DEMICHELE ACLARK ASTAN KS et al., "CDK 4/6 inhibitor palbociclib (PD-0332991) in Rb+ advanced breast cancer: phase II activity, safety, and predictive biomarker assessment", Clin Cancer Res, (20150000), vol. 21, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-2258, pages 995 - 1001, XP055317380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-2258 | - FINN RSMARTIN MRUGO HS et al., "Palbociclib and Letrozole in Advanced Breast Cancer", New Engl J Med, (20160000), vol. 375, no. 20, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1607303, pages 1925 - 36, XP055375437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1607303 | - CRISTOFANILLI MTURNER NCBONDARENKO I et al., "Fulvestrant plus palbociclib versus fulvestrant plus placebo for treatment of hormone-receptor-positive, HER2-negative metastatic breast cancer that progressed on previous endocrine therapy (PALOMA-3): final analysis of the multicentre, double-blind, phase 3 randomised controlled trial", Lancet Oncol, (20160000), vol. 17, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1470-2045(15)00613-0, pages 425 - 39, XP029483315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(15)00613-0 | - KNUDSEN ERIK S.WITKIEWICZ AGNIESZKA K., "The Strange Case of CDK4/6 Inhibitors: Mechanisms, Resistance, and Combination Strategies", Trends Cancer, (20170000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 39 - 55 |