EP3855989 - PORTABLE LUNCHBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexenic AG Klosterstrasse 34 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBEIRO RUIZ, Claudio Quaderstrasse 38A 7205 Zizers / CH | 02 /
MUHL, Reto Wilerstrasse 1 8236 Büttenhardt / CH | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19773832.1 | 25.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019EP75885 | Priority number, date | EP20180197440 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18197440 | [2021/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020064848 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855989 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3855989 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/24, A45C11/20, B65D81/34 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A47J36/2483 (EP,US);
A45C11/20 (EP,US);
A45C13/008 (US);
A45C13/02 (US);
A45C13/10 (US);
A47J36/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORTABLE LUNCHBOX | [2021/31] | English: | PORTABLE LUNCHBOX | [2021/31] | French: | BOÎTE À REPAS PORTABLE | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/31] | BOÎTE À LUNCH PORTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 18.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24152472.7 / EP4353621 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 24.01.2024 | |
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 24.01.2024 | |
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 24.04.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 24.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03101268 (MADES RALF [DE]); | [A]US6947664 (YEH YIN-TING [TW]); | [A]WO2010082762 (KI DONG SEO [KR]); | [A]US2014261381 (RA SU-HWAN [KR]); | [XDA]US2016045054 (SU DAVID [US]); | [A]CN105877474 (LYU ZHONGHUA); | [A]CN107692815 (SUZHOU HEBIERSI ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD); | [AD]CH712870 (HICHAM BANNY [CH], et al) | by applicant | WO2015177726 | US2016045054 | CH712870 |