EP3856414 - MICROFLUIDIC METHOD FOR ANALYSING METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLEARIA 61 Avenue Simone Veil 06200 Nice / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states Klearia Rue Bernard Gregory 06560 Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUNGMENE, Floriant 34 avenue Saint Augustin Résidence Rose de France Batiment E 06200 NICE / FR | 02 /
GAUTRIN, Lisa 10 avenue du Bon Marché 06130 GRASSE / FR | 03 /
MAGNIER, Aurélie 16 rue Théophile Chollet 45000 Orléans / FR | 04 /
NANTEUIL, Clément 144 Bis Avenue de la Colle 06800 CAGNES SUR MER / FR | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19773850.3 | 27.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019EP76142 | Priority number, date | FR20180058997 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858997 | [2021/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020064987 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856414 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N27/48, G01N27/49, G01N33/18, G01N33/20 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
G01N27/48 (EP);
B01L3/502715 (US);
G01N27/49 (EP,US);
G01N33/1813 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0684 (US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/0645 (US);
B01L2300/0819 (US);
B01L2300/0867 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON METALLEN | [2021/31] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC METHOD FOR ANALYSING METALS | [2021/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MICROFLUIDIQUE D'ANALYSE DE MÉTAUX | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 26.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02103342 (INTERNAT TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATES [US]); | [IY]EP1852703 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [XYI]JP2009294060 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]CN108344792 (WUHAN ACAD AGRICULTURAL SCIENCES) | by applicant | EP2576056 |