EP3843928 - TOOL FOR MACHINING FESTOONS AND ATTACHMENT HOLES OF A DISC FLANGE BY PECM AND METHOD USING THIS TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECOMTE, Janvier François c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 02 /
AUVRAY, Estelle Michèle Nicole c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | 03 /
TALLON, Sophie Anne-Laure c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | [2023/33] |
Former [2021/27] | 01 /
LECOMTE, Janvier, François c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | ||
02 /
AUVRAY, Estelle, Michèle, Nicole c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | |||
03 /
TALLON, Sophie, Anne-Laure c/o Safran Aircraft Engines PI (AJI) Rond-point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19774149.9 | 28.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019FR51982 | Priority number, date | FR20180057838 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: FR 1857838 | [2021/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043989 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843928 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3843928 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23H3/04, B23H9/10, F01D5/06 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
B23H3/04 (EP,US);
B23H9/10 (EP,US);
B23H3/10 (US);
F01D25/285 (EP);
F01D5/025 (EP,US);
F01D5/066 (EP);
F05D2230/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUM BEARBEITEN VON GIRLANDEN UND BEFESTIGUNGSLÖCHERN EINES SCHEIBENFLANSCHES MITTELS PECM UND VERFAHREN MIT DIESEM WERKZEUG | [2021/27] | English: | TOOL FOR MACHINING FESTOONS AND ATTACHMENT HOLES OF A DISC FLANGE BY PECM AND METHOD USING THIS TOOL | [2021/27] | French: | OUTILLAGE POUR L'USINAGE DE FESTONS ET DE TROUS DE FIXATION D'UNE BRIDE DE DISQUE PAR PCEM ET PROCÉDÉ UTILISANT CET OUTILLAGE | [2023/24] |
Former [2021/27] | OUTILLAGE POUR L'USINAGE DE FESTONS ET DE TROUS DE FIXATION D'UNE BRIDE DE DISQUE PAR PCEM ET PROCEDE UTILISANT CET OUTILLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 26.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | IE | 28.08.2023 | LU | 28.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 28.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR3006925 (SNECMA [FR]) [AD] 1,8,9 * figure 8 *; | [A] - KLOCKE FRITZ ET AL, "Turbomachinery component manufacture by application of electrochemical, electro-physical and photonic processes", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, (20140702), vol. 63, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CIRP.2014.05.004, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 703 - 726, XP029041329 [A] 1-10 * page 708, column r, paragraph 2; figure 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cirp.2014.05.004 | by applicant | FR3006925 | FR3042138 |