EP3847714 - ELECTRIC MODULE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF BATTERY CELLS SUBMERGED IN A DIELECTRIC FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-MERSIV ZA Bersol 6 avenue de la Grande Lande 33170 Gradignan / FR | [2022/51] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Exoes 6 avenue de la Grande Lande Z.A. Bersol 33170 Gradignan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERGUCCI, Frédéric 190, rue Guillaume Leblanc BORDEAUX 33000 / FR | 02 /
WATTS, Stéphane 30, rue Michelet 33260 LA TESTE DE BUCH / FR | 03 /
DACCORD, Rémi 18, rue du Moulineau 33170 GRADIGNAN / FR | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19774165.5 | 02.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019FR52019 | Priority number, date | WO2019FR52019 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: PCT/FR2019/052019 | [2021/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020049248 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3847714 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/651, H01M10/653, H01M10/6567, H01M2/10, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/6569, H01M2/20, H01M10/48, H01M10/42 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M50/242 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP);
H01M10/651 (EP);
H01M10/653 (EP);
H01M10/6567 (EP);
H01M10/6569 (EP);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
H01M50/291 (EP,US);
H01M50/293 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M10/643 (EP);
H01M10/6568 (EP);
H01M10/667 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES MODUL MIT MEHREREN IN EINER DIELEKTRISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UNTERGETAUCHTEN BATTERIEZELLEN | [2021/28] | English: | ELECTRIC MODULE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF BATTERY CELLS SUBMERGED IN A DIELECTRIC FLUID | [2021/28] | French: | MODULE ELECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITE DE CELLULES DE BATTERIES IMMERGEES DANS UN FLUIDE DIELECTRIQUE | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 05.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007259258 (BUCK DERRICK SCOTT [US]) [Y] 5-9 * paragraph [0033]; figures 3,5; claim 24 *; | [XY]DE102015200700 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0049] , [0051] * [Y] 5-9; | [XY]FR3037727 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,10 * page 5, line 1 - line 28; figure 1 * * page 7, line 2 - line 15; figures 3a,3b * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 3; figure 2 * [Y] 5-9; | [A]US2017047625 (BHUNIA AVIJIT [US], et al) [A] 1,10* paragraphs [0037] , [0053]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2018015216 (BRUGG ROHR AG HOLDING [CH]) [Y] 8,9 * page 13, line 18 - line 19 *; | [Y]WO2018047540 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * | by applicant | US2012242144 | WO2014176320 | EP2806481 | EP3166175 |