EP3773505 - METHODS FOR CONTINUOUS MANUFACTURE OF LIPOSOMAL DRUG PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Insmed Incorporated 700 US Highway 202/206 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-1704 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORSHAM, Robert c/o Insmed Incorporated 10 Finderne Avenue, Building 10 Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19774338.8 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24901 | Priority number, date | US201862650372P | 30.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862650372 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191627 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773505 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, B01F3/08, B01F5/04 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B01F23/41 (EP);
A61K9/1277 (EP,US);
A61K31/145 (US);
A61K31/4174 (US);
A61K31/4196 (US);
A61K31/42 (US);
A61K31/4375 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/5025 (US);
A61K31/505 (US);
A61K31/65 (US);
A61K31/7036 (US);
A61K31/7048 (US);
A61K38/14 (US);
B01F23/4105 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON LIPOSOMALEN ARZNEIMITTELPRODUKTEN | [2021/07] | English: | METHODS FOR CONTINUOUS MANUFACTURE OF LIPOSOMAL DRUG PRODUCTS | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR LA FABRICATION CONTINUE DE PRODUITS MÉDICAMENTEUX LIPOSOMAUX | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 09.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8900846 (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]); | [Y]WO2016149625 (UNIV CONNECTICUT [US]) | International search | [A]US2002039596 (HARTOUNIAN HARTOUN [US], et al); | [A]WO2016033546 (EMD MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [A]WO2016149625 (UNIV CONNECTICUT [US]); | by applicant | EP0616801 | WO2004110346 | WO2007011940 | WO2007117550 | US7718189 | WO2016149625 | US2017225123 |