EP3778547 - FLUORINATED ORGANIC COMPOUND PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | For all designated states Saga University 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi, Saga 840-8502 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | ||
For all designated states Saga University 1 Honjo-machi Saga-shi, Saga 840-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGASHI, Masahiro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5300001 / JP | 02 /
KISHIKAWA, Yosuke c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5300001 / JP | 03 /
KITAMURA, Tsugio c/o SAGA UNIVERSITY 1, Honjo-machi Saga-shi, Saga 840-8502 / JP | [2024/31] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
HIGASHI, Masahiro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | ||
02 /
KISHIKAWA, Yosuke c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
03 /
KITAMURA, Tsugio c/o SAGA UNIVERSITY 1, Honjo-machi Saga-shi, Saga 840-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19774411.3 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP14277 | Priority number, date | JP20180067377 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018067377 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019189861 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778547 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778547 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/307, C07C69/757 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C07C67/307 (EP,RU,US);
C07C69/66 (RU)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/307, C07C69/738 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORIERTEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2021/07] | English: | FLUORINATED ORGANIC COMPOUND PRODUCTION METHOD | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ ORGANIQUE FLUORÉ | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2020 | Translation filed | 13.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003113131 (TOKYO KASEI KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2015157788 (UNIV SAGA, et al); | by applicant | JP2015157788 |