EP3777370 - HANDLING OF TEMPORARY NON ACCESS STRATUM PARAMETERS DURING REGISTRATION PROCEDURE FOR THE UE SUPPORTING REGISTRATION TO THE NETWORK USING 3GPP NETWORK ACCESS AND NON-3GPP NETWORK ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIWARI, Kundan c/o NEC Technologies India Pvt. Ltd., SP Infocity Block-A, 9th Floor, Module-2A, 40, MGR Salai Kandanchavadi, Perungudi Chennai, Tamil Nadu 600096 / IN | 02 /
TAMURA, Toshiyuki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/07] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19775078.9 | 09.01.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP00339 | Priority number, date | IN201811011620 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: IN201811011620 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019187483 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777370 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3777370 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W60/00, H04W76/11, // H04W8/26, H04W60/04, H04W76/16 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H04W76/11 (EP);
H04W60/005 (US);
H04W60/00 (EP);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W60/04 (EP);
H04W76/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W60/00, H04W76/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON TEMPORÄREN NON-ACCESS-STRATUM-PARAMETERN WÄHREND DES REGISTRIERUNGSPROZESSES FÜR DIE UE ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER REGISTRIERUNG IM NETZWERK UNTER VERWENDUNG VON 3GPP-NETZWERKZUGRIFF UND NICHT-3GPP-NETZWERKZUGRIFF | [2021/07] | English: | HANDLING OF TEMPORARY NON ACCESS STRATUM PARAMETERS DURING REGISTRATION PROCEDURE FOR THE UE SUPPORTING REGISTRATION TO THE NETWORK USING 3GPP NETWORK ACCESS AND NON-3GPP NETWORK ACCESS | [2021/07] | French: | GESTION DE PARAMÈTRES DE STRATE SANS ACCÈS TEMPORAIRES PENDANT UNE PROCÉDURE D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR L'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR PRENANT EN CHARGE L'ENREGISTREMENT SUR LE RÉSEAU À L'AIDE D'UN ACCÈS RÉSEAU 3GPP ET D'UN ACCÈS RÉSEAU NON 3GPP | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Clarification on Registration over 3GPP access and non-3GPP access", vol. CT WG1, no. Kochi (India); 20171023 - 20171027, (20171027), 3GPP DRAFT; C1-174329_WAS C1-174178_CLARIFICATION ON REGISTRATION OVER 3GPP ACCESS AND NON-3GPP ACCESS_24.890, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCI, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ct/WG1_mm-cc-sm_ex-CN1/TSGC1_106_Kochi/docs/, (20171027), XP051349559 [Y] 1,2 * Sections 1-3 * | [Y] - INTEL, "Update to support of non-3GPP access in 5GC", vol. SA WG2, no. Reno, US; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171121), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-178316 UPDATE TO SUPPORT OF NON-3GPP ACCESS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F124%5FReno/Docs/, (20171121), XP051379360 [Y] 1,2 * Section 5.3.2.4 * | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; 5G System - Phase 1; CT WG1 Aspects (Release 15)", (20180320), 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_24890-F10, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fct/WG1%5Fmm%2Dcc%2Dsm%5Fex%2DCN1/TSGC1%5F110%5FKunming/draftspecs%5FafterCT79/, (20180320), XP051412259 [Y] 1,2 * Section 8.5.2.1.2.2, 8.5.2.1.3.2, Table 8.9.1 * | International search | [Y] - Intel, "Update to of non-3GPP access in 5GC", 3GPP TSG SA WG2 #123, (20171017), pages 2 - 177046, XP051359738 [Y] 1, 2 * , Section 5.3.2.4 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; 5G System - Phase 1; CT WG1 Aspects (Release 15)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Report; 3GPP TR 24.890, (20171228), no. V15.0.0, pages 1 - 292, XP051450288 [Y] 1, 2 * , Section 8.5.2.1.2.2, 8.5.2.1.3.2, Table 8.9.1 * | by applicant | IN201811011620 | - "Clarification on Registration over 3GPP access and non-3GPP access", LG ELECTRONICS, C1-174329 WAS Cl-174178 CLARIFICATION ON REGISTRATION OVER 3GPP ACCESS AND NON-3GPP ACCESS 24.890, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP, MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20171023), vol. CT WG1 | - "Update to support of non-3GPP access in 5GC", INTEL, S2-178316 UPDATE TO SUPPORT OF NON-3GPP ACCESS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP, MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20171121), vol. SA WG2 | - 3GPP TS 38.300 | - 3GPP TS 24.501 |