EP3778592 - PSMA-TARGETED RADIOPHARMACEUTICAL FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Futurechem Co., Ltd. 2nd Floor 21 Yeonmujang 3-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHI, Dae Yoon 2F, 21, Yeonmujang 3-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Byoung Se 2F, 21, Yeonmujang 3-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | 03 /
CHU, So Young 2F, 21, Yeonmujang 3-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Hyeon Jin 2F, 21, Yeonmujang 3-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Min Hwan 2F, 21, Yeonmujang 3-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Kyo Chul No 105-1103, 22, Seolleung-ro 126-gil Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | 07 /
LEE, Yong Jin No 102-903, 30, Deongneung-ro 71-gil Nowon-gu, Seoul / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19775196.9 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR03716 | Priority number, date | KR20180037226 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: KR 20180037226 | [2021/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019190266 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778592 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778592 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, A61K51/04, A61P35/00, C07D257/02 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C07D257/02 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP,KR);
A61K51/0487 (US);
A61K51/0402 (EP);
A61K51/0474 (KR);
A61K51/0497 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGEN PSMA GERICHTETES RADIOPHARMAZEUTIKUM ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS | [2021/07] | English: | PSMA-TARGETED RADIOPHARMACEUTICAL FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING PROSTATE CANCER | [2021/07] | French: | AGENTS RADIOPHARMACEUTIQUES CIBLÉS SUR PSMA POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | Translation filed | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 21.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 26.04.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/50] | IS | 26.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013022797 (MOLECULAR INSIGHT PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-11 * claims 1-6, 33-37 * * paragraph [0105] * * page 0126 * [I] 4,8; | [E]WO2019246445 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [E] 1-3,5-7,9-11 * claims 1, 22, 41, 44-48, 50 ** page 70; compound 9 *; | [X] - MATTHIAS EDER ET AL, "68 Ga-Complex Lipophilicity and the Targeting Property of a Urea-Based PSMA Inhibitor for PET Imaging", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20120418), vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1021/bc200279b, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 688 - 697, XP055043532 [X] 1-3,5-7 * scheme 1; page 691; compound 8 * * paragraph bridging pages 691 and 692;; compound 68Ga8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc200279b | International search | [X]US2017081298 (RAY SANGEETA [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * See abstract; and claims 1-22. *; | [X]WO2017165473 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1-11 * See abstract; pages 2, 3; claims 1-17; and figure 4. *; | [X] - KUMAR, A. et al., "Design of a Small-Molecule Drug Conjugate for Prostate Cancer Targeted Theranostics", Biocoruugate Chemistry, (20160000), vol. 27, doi:10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.6b00222, pages 1681 - 1689, XP055638802 [X] 1-11 * See abstract; compound 11; and formula 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.6b00222 | [X] - PILLAI, M. R. A. et al., "Radiolabeled enzyme inhibitors and binding agents targeting PSMA: effective theranostic tools for imaging and therapy of prostate cancer", Nuclear Medicine and Biology, (20160000), vol. 43, doi:10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2016.08.006, pages 692 - 720, XP029774672 [X] 1-11 * See abstract; and figure 18(a). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2016.08.006 | [X] - BANERJEE, S. R. et al., "Effect of chelators on the pharmacokinetics of 99mTc-labeled imaging agents for the prostate-specific membrane antigen (PSMA", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20130000), vol. 56, doi:10.1021/jm400823w, pages 6108 - 6121, XP055280715 [X] 1-11 * See abstract; and figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm400823w | by applicant | - MARESCA, K. P. et al., J. Med. Chem., (20090000), vol. 52, pages 347 - 357 |