EP3773808 - AUTOINJECTOR WITH A LINEAR ACTUATOR HAVING A HOLLOW DRIVE SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QuiO Technologies LLC 850 South Clark Street, Suite 1114 Chicago, IL 60605 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHMANI, Alexander 200 East 33rd Street, Apt. 11a New York, NY 10016 / US | 02 /
SCHWARTZENTRUBER, Jared 25-74 33rd St. Apt. 6J Astoria, NY 10025 / US | [2021/09] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
DAHMANI, Alexander 200 East 33rd Street, Apt. 11a New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
02 /
SCHWARTZENTRUBER, Jared 929 Amsterdam Avenue, Apt. 2S New York, NY 10025 / US | Representative(s) | ETL IP Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Clayallee 343 14169 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19775763.6 | 26.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24085 | Priority number, date | US201862648762P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648762 P | US201862648766P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648766 P | US201862648770P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648770 P | US201862648772P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648772 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191104 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3773808 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/315, F16H25/20 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61M5/20 (EP);
A61M5/31528 (EP,US);
A61M5/2033 (US);
A61M5/28 (US);
A61M5/31525 (US);
A61M5/31558 (US);
A61M5/31575 (EP);
A61M5/31583 (EP);
A61M5/3202 (US);
A61M5/3204 (US);
A61M2005/31588 (EP);
A61M2205/103 (EP);
A61M2205/12 (US);
A61M2205/14 (US);
F16H2025/2075 (EP);
F16H2025/2087 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61M5/20, F16H25/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | AUTOINJEKTOR MIT EINEM LINEARAKTUATOR MIT EINER HOHLEN ANTRIEBSWELLE | [2021/07] | English: | AUTOINJECTOR WITH A LINEAR ACTUATOR HAVING A HOLLOW DRIVE SHAFT | [2021/07] | French: | AUTO-INJECTEUR AVEC ACTIONNEUR LINÉAIRE AYANT UN ARBRE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT CREUX | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Observations by third parties | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1180843 (EDUARD BAUTZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 23] * [I] 3; | [X]US2003167866 (DURSCHMIED FRANK [DE]) [X] 1,10-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 11] ** figure 1 *; | [XAI]EP3199190 (MEDIMOP MEDICAL PROJECTS LTD [IL]) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0146] - [0161] * * figures 6A-6F * [A] 15 [I] 3 | International search | [A]US5219099 (SPENCE CHARLES F [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * ; column 4, lines 63-68, column 5, lines 1-2, column 6, lines 62-68, column 7, lines 1-8 *; | [A]US2002049415 (FUKUDA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-24* ; paragraph [0008] *; | [A]WO2018009509 (QUIO TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-24 * ; paragraph [0032], figure 4 * | by applicant | EP1180843 | US2003167866 | EP3199190 | other | US4613328 | US5505697 | US2005171476 | CN102602018 | WO2015141202 |