EP3781187 - LIVER TROPIC RECOMBINANT AAV6 VECTORS THAT EVADE NEUTRALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asklepios Biopharmaceutical, Inc. 870 Martin Luther King Jr. Blvd. Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Incorporated 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMULSKI, R. Jude 102 Darlin Circle Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27514 / US | 02 /
AGBANDJE-MCKENNA, Mavis LG-171 McKnight Brain Institute 1149 Newell Drive Gainesville, Florida 32610 / US | 03 /
BENNETT, Antonette LG-171 McKnight Brain Institute 1149 Newell Drive Gainesville, Florida 32610 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19776047.3 | 28.03.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US24567 | Priority number, date | US201862649691P | 29.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862649691 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191418 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781187 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, C07K14/015, C12N15/86, C12N15/861 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14122 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | TROPISCHE REKOMBINANTE AAV6-LEBERVEKTOREN ZUR UMGEHUNG DER NEUTRALISIERUNG | [2021/08] | English: | LIVER TROPIC RECOMBINANT AAV6 VECTORS THAT EVADE NEUTRALIZATION | [2021/08] | French: | VECTEURS AAV6 DE RECOMBINAISON TROPIQUES DU FOIE QUI ÉVITENT LA NEUTRALISATION | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006110689 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2014193716 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XYI]WO2015121501 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,12,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15; | [T] - ANTONETTE D. BENNETT ET AL, "AAV6 K531 serves a dual function in selective receptor and antibody ADK6 recognition", VIROLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180501), vol. 518, doi:10.1016/j.virol.2018.03.007, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 369 - 376, XP055739763 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2018.03.007 | [T] - LONGPING VICTOR TSE ET AL, "Structure-guided evolution of antigenically distinct adeno-associated virus variants for immune evasion", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20170613), vol. 114, no. 24, doi:10.1073/pnas.1704766114, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E4812 - E4821, XP055590029 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1704766114 | [T] - LIN-YA HUANG ET AL, "Characterization of the Adeno-Associated Virus 1 and 6 Sialic Acid Binding Site", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, US, (20160601), vol. 90, no. 11, doi:10.1128/JVI.00161-16, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5219 - 5230, XP055579418 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00161-16 | International search | [A]WO2017106236 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA CHAPEL HILL [US]) [A] 1-4, 5/1-3, 15-18, 27-29, 30/27, 31-33 * ; paragraphs [0112], [0251], [0273] *; | [A] - SONNTAG, F et al., "The Assembly-Activating Protein Promotes Capsid Assembly of Different Adeno-Associated Virus Serotypes", Journal of Virology, (20111200), vol. 85, no. 23, doi:10.1128/JVI.05359-11, pages 12686 - 12697, XP055187887 [A] 1-4, 5/1-3, 15, 17-18 * ; page 12690, 1st column, 2nd paragraph; figure 3A; DOI: 10.1128/JVI.05359-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.05359-11 | [A] - NANCE, ME et al., "Perspective on Adeno-Associated Virus Capsid Modification for Duchenne Muscular Dystrophy Gene Therapy", Human Gene Therapy, (20151200), vol. 26, no. 12, doi:10.1089/hum.2015.107, pages 786 - 800, XP055579733 [A] 1-4, 5/1-3, 15-18, 27-29, 30/27, 31-33 * ; page 795, 1st column, 3rd paragraph; DOI: 10.1089/hum.2015.107 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2015.107 | [A] - TSE, LV et al., "Structure-guided evolution of antigenically distinct adeno-associated virus variants for immune evasion", Proceedings of National Academy of Sciences of the U.S.A., (20170530), vol. 114, no. 24, doi:10.1073/pnas.1704766114, pages E4812 - E4821, XP055590029 [A] 1-4, 5/1-3, 15-18, 27-29, 30/27, 31-33 * ; abstract; DOI: 10.1073/pnas.1704766114 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1704766114 | [A] - KOTTERMAN, MA et al., "Engineering adeno-associated viruses for clinical gene therapy", Nature Reviews Genetics, (20140700), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nrg3742, pages 445 - 451, XP055317129 [A] 16, 24-29, 30/24-27, 31-33 * ; page 8. 1st paragraph: page 9, 1st paragraph; DOI: 10.1038/nrc)3742 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg3742 | [A] - BENNETT, A et al., "AAV6 K531 Serves a Dual Function in Selective Receptor and Antibody ADK6 Recognition", Virology, (20170501), vol. 518, pages 369 - 376, XP055739763 [A] 16, 24-29, 30/24-27, 31-33 * , Supplement 1; page 44, 2nd column, 1st paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2018.03.007 | [A] - LISOWSKI, L et al., "Selection and evaluation of clinically relevant AAV variants in a xenograft liver model", Nature, (20140220), vol. 506, no. 7488, doi:10.1038/nature12875, pages 383 - 386, XP055573596 [A] 24-26, 30/24-26 * ; page 3, 4th paragraph; figure 3B; DOI: 10.1038/nature12875 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature12875 | [A] - HUANG, LY et al., "Characterization of the Adeno-Associated Virus 1 and 6 Sialic Acid Binding Site", Journal of Virology., (20160601), vol. 90, no. 11, doi:10.1128/JVI.00161-16, pages 5219 - 5230, XP055579418 [A] 24-26, 30/24-26 * , 2nd column, 1st paragraph, figure 8; DOI: 10.1128/JVI.00161-16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00161-16 |