EP3774918 - METHODS OF MAKING AND USING GUIDANCE AND NAVIGATION CONTROL PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Systimmune, Inc. 15318 NE 95th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2024/34] |
Former [2023/29] | For all designated states Systimmune, Inc. 15318 NE 95th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
For all designated states Baili-Bio (Chengdu) Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 139 Baili Road Wenjiang District ChengDu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | |||
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states Systimmune, Inc. 15318 NE 95th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
For all designated states Baili-Bio (Chengdu) Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Building 1, 161 Baili Road Wenjiang District ChengDu Sichuan 611130 / CN | |||
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Systimmune, Inc. 15318 NE 95th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
For all designated states Sichuan Baili Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 161 Baili Road Wenjiang District Chengdu, Sichuan / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yi 8-24, Building 6, No. 6, Lidu Road Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan / CN | 02 /
OLSEN, Ole 5309 117th St SE Everett, Washington 98208 / US | 03 /
KHALILI, Jahan 11201 3rd Ave. NE, Unit 39-H Everett, Washington 98026 / US | 04 /
XIA, Dong 17401 NE 97th Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 05 /
JELLYMAN, David 26918 NE Virginia St Duvall, Washington 98019 / US | 06 /
BYKOVA, Katrina 12346 36th Ave NE Seattle, Washington 98125 / US | 07 /
ROUSSEAU, Anne-Marie 11532 Dayton Ave. N. Seattle, Washington / US | 08 /
WANG, Camilla 2664 230th Ave. SE Sammamish, Washington 98075 / US | 09 /
GAO, Zeren 9816 229th LN NE Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | 10 /
HUANG, Hui 15827 NE Leary Way Apt B117 Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 11 /
LUNDY, Steven K. 18250 142nd Ave NE Apt 401 Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Hobson, David James, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Hobson, David James, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19776947.4 | 26.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24111 | Priority number, date | US201862648888P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648888 P | US201862648880P | 27.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648880 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019191125 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774918 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K39/395 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61K35/13 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/17 (CN,IL,KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/464402 (EP,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (CN,IL,US);
C07K14/70503 (IL,US);
C07K14/7051 (IL,US);
C07K14/70532 (IL,US);
C07K14/70578 (IL,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C12N5/0693 (CN,IL,US);
G01N33/57488 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (CN);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/524 (CN,IL,US);
C07K2317/526 (CN,IL,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/70 (EP,CN,IL);
C07K2317/73 (EP,CN,IL);
C07K2317/74 (EP,CN,IL);
C07K2317/76 (EP,CN,IL);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, C07K16/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON ANLEITUNGS- UND NAVIGATIONSSTEUERPROTEINEN | [2021/07] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING AND USING GUIDANCE AND NAVIGATION CONTROL PROTEINS | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION DE PROTÉINES DE CONTRÔLE DE GUIDAGE ET DE NAVIGATION | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1354600 (AFFIMED THERAPEUTICS AG [DE]); | [XI]WO2017178572 (VIVIA BIOTECH SL [ES]); | International search | [Y]WO2017064221 (AFFIMED GMBH [DE]); | [XY]US2017210819 (CHEUNG NAI-KONG V [US], et al); |