EP3777642 - FLEXIBLE TUBE FOR ENDOSCOPE, ENDOSCOPIC MEDICAL DEVICE AND RESIN COMPOSITION FOR COVERING FLEXIBLE TUBE BASE MATERIAL FOR ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAI, Yoshihiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
FURUKAWA, Kazushi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19777274.2 | 25.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019JP12609 | Priority number, date | JP20180063153 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018063153 | [2021/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019189035 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777642 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005, C08K5/3435, C08K5/372, C08K5/524, C08L101/12, G02B23/24, C08K5/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
C08K5/32 (EP,US);
A61B1/0011 (EP);
A61B1/005 (EP,US);
A61L29/06 (US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61L29/143 (EP);
B32B1/08 (EP);
B32B15/082 (EP);
B32B15/088 (EP);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/095 (EP);
B32B15/18 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
C08K5/13 (US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08K5/372 (EP,US);
C08K5/524 (EP,US);
C08L101/12 (EP);
C09D177/02 (EP);
C09D177/06 (EP);
A61M2025/0059 (US);
A61M25/0043 (EP);
A61M25/005 (EP,US);
A61M25/0052 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/702 (EP);
B32B2307/714 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L29/085, C08L33/08 (EP);
A61L29/085, C08L67/02 (EP);
A61L29/085, C08L75/04 (EP);
A61L29/085, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L101/12, C08K5/3435, C08K5/372 (EP);
C08L101/12, C08K5/3435, C08K5/524 (EP);
C09D177/02, C08K5/3435, C08K5/372 (EP);
C09D177/02, C08K5/3435, C08K5/524 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61B1/005, C08K5/3435, C08K5/372, C08K5/524, C08L101/12, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER SCHLAUCH FÜR EIN ENDOSKOP, ENDOSKOPISCHE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ABDECKUNG DES BASISMATERIALS DES FLEXIBLEN SCHLAUCHES FÜR EIN ENDOSKOP | [2021/07] | English: | FLEXIBLE TUBE FOR ENDOSCOPE, ENDOSCOPIC MEDICAL DEVICE AND RESIN COMPOSITION FOR COVERING FLEXIBLE TUBE BASE MATERIAL FOR ENDOSCOPE | [2021/07] | French: | TUBE FLEXIBLE POUR ENDOSCOPE, DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ENDOSCOPIQUE ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POUR RECOUVRIR UN MATÉRIAU DE BASE DE TUBE FLEXIBLE POUR ENDOSCOPE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2002 | Translation filed | 11.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2896635 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,16,17 ** table 1 *; | [XI]EP2980466 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,9-15 * claims 1,14,17,19 * * A-12,A-13,A-15,A-16; table 1 * [I] 3-8; | [E]EP3646900 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,9-15 * claims 1,8,9,10 * * Compositions A1,A7,A8,A9,A13-16; table 1 *; | [E]EP3646770 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,9-15 * claims 1,8,9,15 * * Compositions A1,A7,A14,A17; table 1 * | International search | [A]JP2015016261 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0055]-[0056], [0074]-[0077], tables 1-2 & US 2016/0024343 A1, paragraphs [0169]-[0173], [0281]-[0300], tables II & EP 2980466 A1 *; | [A]JP2015154924 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-16* , paragraphs [0047]-[0051] & US 2015/0202352 A1, paragraphs [0068]-[0071] & EP 2896635 A1 *; | [A]JP2015200352 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0065]-[0067] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH1192636 | JP2011527357 | JP2014188217 | JP2015016261 | JP2016209649 | JP2018065153 |